Fisher v. Miliken et al
Plaintiff: Angela Paige Fisher
Defendant: Amy Miliken, Brandi Duvall, Rebecca Gibson and David Lanphear
Case Number: 1:2021cv00140
Filed: October 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Benjamin Beaton
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 bv
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Filing by Angela Paige Fisher (Attachments: #1 Exhibit- unredacted complaint (sealed)) (JM) Modified on 11/16/2021- sealed attachment (JM).
November 9, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time by Plaintiff Angela Paige Fisher (JM)
November 9, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time from the Clerk of Courts by Plaintiff Angela P. Fisher. (JM)
November 5, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE by Angela Paige Fisher (stating she wishes to receive filings via first class mail instead of electronically.) (JM)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: The Court grants the Plaintiff's application to proceed without prepayment of fees (DN #3 ). cc: Plaintiff (pro se) (JM)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (EBOC) on 10/21/2021. The Clerk is directed to restrict electronic access to DN #7 . Plaintiff to file a motion to seal or motion to file redacted version within 30 days of entry of this Order. cc: Plaintiff (pro se) (JM)
October 18, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of State-Court Documents by Angela Paige Fisher (JM)
October 15, 2021 Filing 8 ERROR-Duplicate docket entry by Clerk(See DN #1 -2 to view PDF). Modified on 10/20/2021 (JWM).
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 10/12/2021. Pursuant to 28 USC 455, the Court concludes that recusal in this case is required. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is reassigned to the docket of Judge Benjamin Beaton for all further proceedings and disposition, pursuant to General Order 2020-27. Counsel are instructed to change the civil action number to reflect the initials (BJB) in place and instead of the initials (GNS) on all further pleadings. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Plaintiff, pro se; Case Manager Judge Beaton (TJD)
October 8, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE on Summons re #1 Complaint. (DeW)
October 6, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Angela Paige Fisher. (DeW)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (DeW)
October 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amy Miliken, Brandi Duvall, Rebecca Gibson, David Lanphear, filed by Angela Paige Fisher. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (DeW)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Registration to Receive Documents Electronically by Angela Paige Fisher. (DeW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fisher v. Miliken et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Paige Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Miliken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandi Duvall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lanphear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?