Doe v. Board of Education of Barren County, Kentucky et al
Plaintiff: Mary Doe
Defendant: Board of Education of Barren County, Kentucky and W.K.G.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00153
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Board of Education of Barren County, Kentucky. (Jackson, Regina)
December 16, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Doe. Board of Education of Barren County, Kentucky served on 12/15/2021, answer due 1/5/2022. (Silva, Adria)
December 6, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Doe. W.K.G. served on 11/22/2021, answer due 12/13/2021. (Silva, Adria)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 11/22/2021 granting #5 Motion for Adria Lynn Silva to Appear Pro Hac Vice cc: Counsel; Adria Lynn Silva(JWM)
November 19, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Adria Lynn Silva to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number AKYWDC-3474842. by Plaintiff Mary Doe (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Court Admissions & Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Mendiondo, Adrian)
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Mary Doe. Amendment to #1 Complaint, Corrected Civil Cover Sheet by Mary Doe. (Mendiondo, Adrian)
November 18, 2021 Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to Board of Education of Barren County, Kentucky, W.K.G. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (CDF)
November 18, 2021 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (CDF)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Board of Education of Barren County, Kentucky, W.K.G., filed by Mary Doe. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AKYWDC-3473526.) (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 TENDERED Summons - Board of Education, #3 TENDERED Summons - W.K.G.) (CDF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Board of Education of Barren County, Kentucky et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Doe
Represented By: Adrian Martin Mendiondo
Represented By: Adria Lynn Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Education of Barren County, Kentucky
Represented By: Regina A. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.K.G.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?