Sang v. Misumi U.S.A., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bawi Sang
Defendant: Misumi U.S.A., Inc. and Daiwa Dengyo Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00038
Filed: March 23, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Referring Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers (EBOC) on 5/8/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 6/23/2023 10:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. Meeting of the parties due by 6/2/2023. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/16/2023. cc:counsel; KLL-Case Manager (JWM)
May 8, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and in accordance with Rule 73(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that a United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or non-jury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. You may consent to have your case referred to a Magistrate Judge, or you may withhold your consent without adverse consequences. Should all parties consent to having a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, please complete the #Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge and send a copy of this document to the clerks office via regular mail or email at # intake-kywECF@kywd.uscourts.gov. (TJD)
May 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 5/8/2023; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Brennenstuhl is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel of Record; KLL (TJD)
March 30, 2023 Filing 8 Diversity Case Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(2)) by Bawi Sang. (Conley, Shea)
March 30, 2023 Filing 7 Diversity Case Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(2)) by Misumi U.S.A., Inc.. (Mattingly, Stephen)
March 24, 2023 Filing 6 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Misumi U.S.A., Inc.. Amendment to Answer to Complaint (DN #1 ) by Misumi U.S.A., Inc.. (Mattingly, Stephen) Modified to add docket/entry relationships on 3/27/2023 (JWM).
March 23, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal to Stephen J. Mattingly, attorney for defendant. Reason for Deficiency: Missing 7.1 (a)(2) Disclosure Statement for Misumi U.S.A., Inc. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 3/30/2023. (CDL)
March 23, 2023 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE to Warren Circuit Court and Counsel/Parties re #1 Notice of Removal. (CDL)
March 23, 2023 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (CDL)
March 23, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) identifying Corporate Parent Misumi Corporation, Other Affiliate Misumi Group, Inc. for Misumi U.S.A., Inc. (CDL)
March 23, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Misumi U.S.A., Inc. from Warren Circuit Court, case number 23-CI-00168, (Filing fee $402, receipt number AKYWDC-3776190), filed by Misumi U.S.A., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Answer to Amended Complaint, #3 Cover Sheet) (CDL)
March 23, 2023 ANSWER to Complaint (Filed in Warren Circuit Court - See DN #1 -2.) by Misumi U.S.A., Inc. (CDL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sang v. Misumi U.S.A., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bawi Sang
Represented By: Shea W. Conley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Misumi U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: David N. Giesel
Represented By: Stephen J. Mattingly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daiwa Dengyo Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?