Chojecki v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Marcin A. Chojecki
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2023cv00074
Filed: May 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: H Brent Brennenstuhl
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD received from Social Security. Social Security Submission due by 10/10/2023. by Commissioner of Social Security. (Muir, Chad)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad Muir on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Muir, Chad)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice of Social Security Case Assignment re #1 Complaint. Social Security Notice due by 6/22/2023. (DJT)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF SERVICE: Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. 405(g) and #General Order 2023-2:, the Court hereby notifies the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration and the United States Attorney's Office for the Western District of Kentucky that a Complaint seeking judicial review has been filed. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the official notification referenced in Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions. The plaintiff does not need to serve separately a summons and complaint under Civil Rule 4. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official Entry. No Document is attached. (DJT)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING OF PROPOSED SUMMONSES by Marcin A. Chojecki (Attachments: #1 Summonses Combined) (Daley, Frederick)
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION for Joseph S. Sellers to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number AKYWDC-3818696. by Plaintiff Marcin A. Chojecki (Daley, Frederick)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: No Summons Tendered with Complaint. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 6/6/2023. (DJT)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl. (DJT)
May 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AKYWDC-3817243., filed by Marcin A. Chojecki. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (DJT) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/1/2023: #2 Summons) (DJT).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chojecki v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcin A. Chojecki
Represented By: Frederick J. Daley, Jr.
Represented By: Joseph S. Sellers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Benjamin Seth Schecter
Represented By: Timothy D. Thompson
Represented By: Chad Muir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?