Hartman v. Polaris Industries, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Roy Hartman
Defendant: Polaris Industries, Inc. and Jared Carter
Case Number: 1:2023cv00095
Filed: July 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2023 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand and for Fees Plaintiff's Reply to Polaris' Response to filed by Roy Hartman. (Childers, Masten)
August 25, 2023 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re MOTION for Attorney Fees, #7 MOTION to Remand and for Fees filed by Polaris Industries, Inc.. (Rodgers, John)
August 22, 2023 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Polaris Industries, Inc.. (Rodgers, John)
August 14, 2023 Filing 8 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Aaron Oppegard re #1 Notice of Removal.Reason for Deficiency: Full Admission to WDKY/motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 8/31/2023. (KJA)
August 4, 2023 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Plaintiff Roy Hartman (No document attached-for reporting purposes only. See DN #7 to view PDF) (JWM)
August 4, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand and for Fees by Plaintiff Roy Hartman (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memo in Support of Remand, #2 Exhibit photo, #3 Exhibit email) (Childers, Masten)
August 3, 2023 Filing 6 Diversity Case Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(2)) by Polaris Industries, Inc.. (Rodgers, John)
July 19, 2023 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(1)) by Polaris Industries, Inc. Corporate Parent - Polaris, Inc. (Rodgers, John) Modified corporate parent and docket text on 7/20/2023 (DeW).
July 18, 2023 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Warren Circuit Court (MNM)
July 18, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal. Reason for Deficiency: Rule 7.1(a)(1) Corporate Disclosure Statement and Rule 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/25/2023. (MNM)
July 18, 2023 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers. (MNM)
July 18, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Polaris Industries, Inc. from Warren Circuit Court, case number 23-CI-00941 (filing fee $402, receipt number AKYWDC-3846501). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court File, #2 Cover Sheet) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartman v. Polaris Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Hartman
Represented By: Masten Childers, III
Represented By: Aaron Oppegard
Represented By: Justin S. Peterson
Represented By: Kellie M. Collins
Represented By: Laura Jane Phelps
Represented By: Michael W. Durborow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Polaris Industries, Inc.
Represented By: John P. Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jared Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?