Donaway et al v. Rohm and Haas Company, Louisville Plant
Case Number: 3:2006cv00575
Filed: November 9, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Office: Louisville Office
Presiding Judge: John G. Heyburn
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 7/23/13. For reasons set forth DN 179 Motion for Summary Judgment is SUSTAINED. Pltfs' remaining claimes for nuisance are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. This is a final and appealable order. cc:counsel (SJS)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 189 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge John G. Heyburn, II granting 176 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice all claims of Ronnie Meredith, Hannah Meredity, Lisa Meredith, Murle Fuqua, Eric Cox, Ralph Burchett adn Darline Burchett for failure to provid e discovery or appear at depos; granting 178 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice the nuance claims of Rocie Bendixen, Edward Humphrey, Jr., Michael Blair, David Lewis, David Watts and Gary McGrew; Court will consider dft's remaining mtn for summary jgm in due course. cc:counsel (MLG)
August 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 8/29/12 denying 130 Motion to Strike Expert Witness Disclosure; Dispositive motions schedule established in the Courts Docket No. 138 shall remain in effect; Any remaining discovery regarding Plaintiffs experts may be conducted prior to October 10, 2012; Parties shall expect that the Court will set a telephone conference in the coming weeks to discuss any further procedural or substantive issues. cc:counsel (DAK)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 1/31/2012; 111 Motion to Strike is SUSTAINED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Plaintiffs' claims for personal injuries are to be stricken from the Fifth Amended Complaint, but allegation s relating to particulates and substances aside from Methyl Methacrylate will remain. Plaintiffs' expert disclosures due 3/28/2012. 111 Motion to Dismiss is SUSTAINED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Plaintiffs' strict liability claims are DISMISSED, but trespass allegations will proceed. Defendant to submit list identifying those parties being challenged as individual plaintiffs by 2/28/2012 with plaintiffs' response due 3/28/2012. cc:counsel (TLB)
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 11/13/2009; Plaintiff's request for leave to amend the complaint GRANTED. Plaintiffs have ten (10) days from the entry of this Order to file an amended complaint. cc: Counsel (AEP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Donaway et al v. Rohm and Haas Company, Louisville Plant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?