Downs et al v. Insight Communications Company, L.P.

Plaintiff: Michelle Downs and Laurie Jarrett
Defendant: Insight Communications Company, L.P.
Case Number: 3:2009cv00093
Filed: February 13, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Office: Anti-Trust Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Simpson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER denying 169 Motion for Reconsideration; Signed by Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr on 12/1/14. cc: Counsel (DJT)
July 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 146 Motion for Summary Judgment; Signed by Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr on 7/29/14: The Court will enter a judgment consistent with this Opinion. cc: Counsel(DJT)
March 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 59 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr on 3/22/11. cc:counsel (JBM)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 6/2/2010; re 25 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. For the reasons set forth, Motion will be granted and the Complaint dismissed, but the Court will grant Plaintiffs' request to file an Amended Complaint curing the flaws located herein. Separate Order will be entered. cc: Counsel (RLK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Downs et al v. Insight Communications Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Downs
Represented By: Matthew L. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Jarrett
Represented By: Matthew L. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insight Communications Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?