Texas Capital Bank, N.A. et al v. First American Title Insurance Co. et al
Plaintiff: Texas Capital Bank, N.A., Liberty Mutual Insurance Europe Limited trading as LIberty International Underwriters and Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Who Are Members of Syndicate Nos. 4444, 2003 and 4000 Subscribing to Bond No. FA054730G002
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Co. and First American Trust, FSB
Case Number: 3:2009cv00661
Filed: August 27, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Office: Louisville Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: John G. Heyburn
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 2/17/12 sustaining 80 Plaintiffs motion for leave to file their SecondAmended Complaint cc:counsel (DAK)
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 02/09/12 sustaining 81 Motion to Strike third-party complaint; finding as moot 65 Motion for Default Judgment on third-party complaint; and granting 82 Motion to Prohibit First American from Apportioning Fault to Bounmy Phouthavong; Defendant is Granted leave to file a third-party complaint for indemnity against Phouthavong.cc:counsel (DAK)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 83 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 9/23/2011. For the reasons set forth, Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Count 1 is DENIED and Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Count 1 is DENIED. Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Plaintiffs' claims involving the National City Wires is SUSTAINED and all Plaintiffs' claims for those damages are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. A court trial is currently set for 5/15/2012. The Court will set a conference in the near future. cc: Counsel (AEP)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER signed by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 5/10/2010. For the reasons set forth, 28 Motion for Leave to File a First Amended Complaint is SUSTAINED. 7 Motion to Dismiss is partially SUSTAINED in that Defendant First American Trust is dismissed without prejudice. The remainder of the Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. 26 Motion to Strike is moot. This is NOT a final order. cc: Counsel (AEP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Texas Capital Bank, N.A. et al v. First American Title Insurance Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas Capital Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Lee A. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Insurance Europe Limited trading as LIberty International Underwriters
Represented By: Lee A. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London Who Are Members of Syndicate Nos. 4444, 2003 and 4000 Subscribing to Bond No. FA054730G002
Represented By: Lee A. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Title Insurance Co.
Represented By: T. Morgan Ward, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American Trust, FSB
Represented By: T. Morgan Ward, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?