Sadler et al v. Advanced Bionics, LLC
Plaintiff: Brian Sadler and Michelle Sadler
Defendant: Advanced Bionics, LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv00450
Filed: August 11, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Office: Louisville Office
County: Hardin
Presiding Judge: John G. Heyburn
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 243 Jury Instructions. (KJA)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 89 Motion in Limine. Signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 4/3/2013. cc:counsel (KJA)
April 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 4/1/2013. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Limit the Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Tom Green, (ECF No. 117 ), is SUSTAINED IN PART and DENIED IN PART consistent with the foregoing Opinion. cc: Counsel (CDF)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 182 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 3/26/12; 115 Defendants Motion in Limine Number 4 is SUSTAINED in part and DENIED in part; 93 Plaintiffs Motion to Deem Documents Admissible is SUSTAINED in part, DENIED in part; 109 Defendants Motion in Limine Number 3 is SUSTAINED. cc:counsel (DAK)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 3/15/13 sustaining 163 Motion for Leave to File Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment on Emotional Distress Claim. Motion for summary judgment on the emotional distress claim shall have responses filed on or before March 21, 2013. Any replies shall be filed on or before MARCH 27, 2013. Then the matter will be submitted for ruling. cc:counsel (DAK)
March 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 3/7/2013 re 63 Motion for Summary Judgment; motion for summary judgment as to Plaintiffs claims of fraud, negligence per se and breach of implied warranty are SUSTAINED and those claims are DISMISSED; motion for summary judgment as to Plaintiffs strict liability claims is DENIED as to those theories discussed within this opinion; motion for summary judgment as to Plaintiffs negligence claims is SUSTAINED for those claims based on f raudulent misrepresentations, fraudulent omissions, and failure to conduct life cycle testing, and DENIED as to all other grounds as discussed within this opinion; motion for summary judgment onMichelle and Brian Sadlers emotional damages claims is DENIED. cc:counsel (TLB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sadler et al v. Advanced Bionics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Sadler
Represented By: Tim Edwards
Represented By: Ronald E. Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: Edwin E. Wallis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Sadler
Represented By: Tim Edwards
Represented By: Ronald E. Johnson, Jr.
Represented By: Edwin E. Wallis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Bionics, LLC
Represented By: Kathryn T. Martin
Represented By: W. Kennedy Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?