Rodgers v. Gilbert et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Rodgers
Defendant: Matt Gilbert, Dismas Charities, Inc. and Bureau of Prisons
Case Number: 3:2011cv00604
Filed: October 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Office: Louisville Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: John G. Heyburn
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 6/29/2012; 19 Motion to Stay is DENIED. cc:counsel (TLB)
April 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 4/27/12; Court denies Plaintiffs request for disclosure of Bowmans Presentence Investigative Report and case is REMANDED to Jefferson Circuit Court. cc:counsel, Jefferson Circuit Court (DAK)
February 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM ORDER AND OPINION by Judge John G. Heyburn, II 9 Motion for Reconsideration; Defendants Motion to Reconsider is SUSTAINED and the Courts Remand Order is STAYED; Plaintiffs original Motion to Remand is nowDENIED. cc:counsel (DAK)
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER by Judge John G. Heyburn, II on 1/11/2012: 3:11CV605 is consolidated with this case; plaintiff's motion to remand is sustained, the consolidated cases are REMANDED to Jefferson Circuit Court cc:counsel (KJA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodgers v. Gilbert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dismas Charities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Prisons
Represented By: Brady Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Rodgers
Represented By: T. Wesley Faulkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?