SBAV LP v. Porter Bancorp, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: SBAV LP
Defendant: Porter Bancorp, Inc., PBI Bank Inc., J. Chester Porter and Maria L. Bouvette
Case Number: 3:2013cv00710
Filed: July 17, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Office: Louisville Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Thomas B. Russell
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332nr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 243 MEMORANDUM OPINION granting 242 Motion to Dismiss; Signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 12/1/15: Accordingly, the Memorandum Opinion and Order of 3/31/2015 197 and the Magistrate Judge's Order of 1/16/2015 179 are VACATED AS MOOT. cc: Counsel(DJT)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 230 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting 201 Motion to Intervene; granting 205 Motion to Stay the Court's Memorandum Opinion & Order of 4/1/2015 DN 198 . Signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 10/13/2015. cc: Counsel(KJA)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 197 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 3/30/2015; re 185 Response to Objections filed by SBAV LP, 179 Order on Motion for Hearing, 181 Objection, filed by Porter Bancorp, Inc., 189 Reply filed by Porter Bancorp, Inc. cc:counsel (KJA)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 9/16/2014; re 136 Third Party MOTION to Dismiss filed by Clinton Group, Inc. ; a separate order shall issuecc:counsel (KJA)
May 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 134 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 5/13/2014; re 93 Joint MOTION to Strike Jury Demand from Amended Complaint filed by Porter Bancorp, Inc., Maria L. Bouvette, J. Chester Porter, PBI Bank, Inc. ; an appropriate order shall issuecc:counsel (KJA)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 3/25/2014; re 92 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Porter Bancorp, Inc., Maria L. Bouvette, J. Chester Porter, PBI Bank, Inc. ; an appropriate order shall issuecc:counsel (KJA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SBAV LP v. Porter Bancorp, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SBAV LP
Represented By: Beth I. Z. Boland
Represented By: Jared A. Craft
Represented By: Trevor L. Earl
Represented By: Stephen Matthew Medow
Represented By: Alicia Marie Reed
Represented By: John S. Reed, II
Represented By: Theo J. Robins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Porter Bancorp, Inc.
Represented By: Theresa A. Canaday
Represented By: Thomas C. Gleason
Represented By: Sheryl G. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PBI Bank Inc.
Represented By: Theresa A. Canaday
Represented By: Thomas C. Gleason
Represented By: Sheryl G. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Chester Porter
Represented By: Theresa A. Canaday
Represented By: Thomas C. Gleason
Represented By: Sheryl G. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria L. Bouvette
Represented By: Theresa A. Canaday
Represented By: Thomas C. Gleason
Represented By: Sheryl G. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?