Coram et al v. Shepherd Communications, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ian Coram, George Bright, Philip Hess, Howard L. Sutton, Jr. and Jerome Trowell
Defendant: Shepherd Communications, Inc., Time Warner Cable, Inc. and Insight Communications Company, L.P.
Case Number: 3:2014cv00298
Filed: April 8, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Office: Louisville Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: James D. Moyer
Presiding Judge: Joseph H. McKinley
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 161 Motion for Procedural Relief: This action is hereby CONDITIONALLY CERTIFIED as a collective action pursuant to Section 216(b) of the FLSA, with such class defined as the named plaintiffs and all indi viduals who have opted into this litigation as of the date of entry of this order, including such individuals who were previously compelled to arbitrate their claims. The Court will NOT ISSUE COURT-SUPERVISED NOTICE to potential additional opt-in plaintiffs for the reasons set forth above. Finally, the parties shall proceed in accordance with the case management deadlines set in the Courts order 164 of 11/13/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 10/19/2015. cc: Counsel(JBM)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER granting in part and denying in part 111 Motion to Stay: The litigation is STAYED from the date of filing of the Joint Motion, 2/2/2015, until 4/20/2015. During the period of time that the stay is in effect, the partie s are free to move the Court to lift or extend the stay. The Court OVERRULES the parties request that it equitably toll the statutes of limitations applicable to the claims in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 2/11/2015. cc: Counsel(JBM)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying as MOOT 23 Motion to Compel Arbitration; denying as MOOT 27 Motion to Compel AND Motion to Stay; granting 39 Motion to Compel; granting 49 Motion to Compel; granting 49 Motion to Stay; Signed by Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr on 9/23/14: The action is stayed. cc: Counsel(DJT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coram et al v. Shepherd Communications, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Coram
Represented By: David W. Garrison
Represented By: Seth M. Hyatt
Represented By: Jerry E. Martin
Represented By: J. Chris Sanders
Represented By: Scott P. Tift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Bright
Represented By: David W. Garrison
Represented By: Seth M. Hyatt
Represented By: Jerry E. Martin
Represented By: J. Chris Sanders
Represented By: Scott P. Tift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Hess
Represented By: David W. Garrison
Represented By: Seth M. Hyatt
Represented By: Jerry E. Martin
Represented By: J. Chris Sanders
Represented By: Scott P. Tift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard L. Sutton, Jr.
Represented By: David W. Garrison
Represented By: Seth M. Hyatt
Represented By: Jerry E. Martin
Represented By: J. Chris Sanders
Represented By: Scott P. Tift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome Trowell
Represented By: David W. Garrison
Represented By: Seth M. Hyatt
Represented By: Jerry E. Martin
Represented By: J. Chris Sanders
Represented By: Scott P. Tift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shepherd Communications, Inc.
Represented By: S. Chad Meredith
Represented By: W. Keith Ransdell
Represented By: John C. Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Warner Cable, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insight Communications Company, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?