Commonwealth of Kentucky v. Marathon Petroleum Company LP
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Kentucky
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Company LP
Case Number: 3:2015cv00354
Filed: May 12, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Office: Louisville Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: David J. Hale
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 221 Memorandum Opinion and Order Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 9/17/2019. The Commonwealth's Motion DN 197 is GRANTED. The Commonwealth's Motions DNs 164 , 192 , 202 , 213 are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Marathon's Motions DNs 155 , 166 , 189 , 194 , 198 , 211 , 210 , 214 , are GRANTED. Parties have 30 DAYS to file additional motions to seal or supplemental redacted versions of Exhibits pursuant to the above Order. DNs 203 -25, [ 203]-32, 203 -45, 215 -2, 215 -3, 193 -2, 193 -10, 193 -16, 165 -7, 165 -8, and 165 -9 shall be PROVISIONALLY SEALED for 30 DAYS. The Court directs the Clerk to unseal any of the documents identified in this paragraph if no party files a motion to seal such documents on or before 10/30/2019. Parties shall comply as set forth in Order. cc: Counsel (MEJ)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 3/1/19: Accordingly, the order will be UNSEALED in 45 days, absent further order by the Court. If any party opposes unsealing the order, it shall file a motion to seal, with citations to applicable law, within 14 days of this Order. Status Report due by 4/15/2019.cc: Counsel (DJT)
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 9/26/2018. Marathon Corp.'s and Speedway's motion to dismiss (D.N. 92 ) is DENIED. Marathon LP's motion to dismiss (D.N. 93 ) is DENIED. This case is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for a status conference. cc: Counsel (MEJ)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Memorandum Opinion and Order by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 6/25/2018 - 87 Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED; 95 Motion to Stay is DENIED; 100 Motion to Seal Document is GRANTED ; 102 Motion to Seal Document is GRANTED; 106 Motion to Seal Document is GRANTED ; 108 Motion to Seal Document is GRANTED ; 123 Motion to Seal Document is GRANTED ; 129 Motion to Seal Document is GRANTED ; 131 Motion to Seal Document is GRANTED. cc: Counsel(DAK)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 10/24/2017 - The Commonwealth's Motion to Amend its First Amended Complaint (DN 71) is GRANTED. The Commonwealth shall file an amended complaint identical to its proposed second amended complaint. cc: Counsel(DAK)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 5/23/2017 - The Court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part the parties' joint motion for a protective order (DN 62). cc: Counsel(DAK)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 12/1/2016 - Marathon's motion to amend order to permit interlocutory appeal (D.N. 48) is DENIED. cc: Counsel(DAK)
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 6/8/2016 - Defendant Marathon Petroleum Company LP's Motion to Dismiss (D.N. 28) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motion is granted as to Plaintiffs unjust enrichment claim (D.N. 18, PageID # 169 (COUNT 7)). The motion is denied as to all other claims. cc: Counsel(DAK)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commonwealth of Kentucky v. Marathon Petroleum Company LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commonwealth of Kentucky
Represented By: Robyn R. Bender
Represented By: Laura S. Crittenden
Represented By: Elizabeth U. Natter
Represented By: Sean J. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marathon Petroleum Company LP
Represented By: Sheryl G. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?