Schiller Kessler & Gomez, PLLC v. Schiller Kessler & Gomez, PLC et al

Plaintiff: Schiller Kessler & Gomez, PLLC
Defendant: Schiller Kessler & Gomez, PLC, Marc Schiller, Andrew Kessler and Marcelo Gomez
Case Number: 3:2016cv00018
Filed: January 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Office: Louisville Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: David J. Hale
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 3/24/2017, re Defendant Schiller Kessler & Gomez's 31 MOTION to Amend 30 Order. cc:counsel (RLK)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 3/16/2017, re Plaintiff's 33 and 34 MOTIONs to Vacate.cc: Counsel (RLK)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 3/9/2017, re Plaintiff's 41 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel. cc: Counsel (RLK)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 12/16/2016, re Defendants' 19 MOTION for Attorney Fees Costs and Expenses pursuant to KRS § 275.337, and Plaintiff's 23 MOTION for Leave to File SurReply. An order will be tendered in accordance with this Memorandum Opinion.cc: Counsel (RLK)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OPINION signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 8/9/2016, re 2 MOTION to Dismiss, 3 MOTION to Intervene, 6 MOTION to Remand, 7 Alternative MOTION to Add a Party Defendant and Remand, 8 MOTION to Hold in Abeyance, and 11 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply. cc: Counsel (RLK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schiller Kessler & Gomez, PLLC v. Schiller Kessler & Gomez, PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Schiller Kessler & Gomez, PLLC
Represented By: Robert D. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schiller Kessler & Gomez, PLC
Represented By: Michael W. McClain
Represented By: Christopher E. Schaefer
Represented By: Shannon A. Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Schiller
Represented By: Michael W. McClain
Represented By: Christopher E. Schaefer
Represented By: Shannon A. Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Kessler
Represented By: Michael W. McClain
Represented By: Christopher E. Schaefer
Represented By: Shannon A. Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcelo Gomez
Represented By: Michael W. McClain
Represented By: Christopher E. Schaefer
Represented By: Shannon A. Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?