Savidge et al v. Pharm-Save, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Savidge, Beth A. Lynch and Andrea K. Savidge
Defendant: Pharm-Save, Inc, Neil Medical Group, Inc. and Pharm-Save, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv00186
Filed: March 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Office: Louisville Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: Regina S Edwards
2 Judge: Thomas B Russell
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE JOINT RESPONSE by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 1/24/2019 granting #53 Motion for Leave to File a Joint Response to Plaintiffs' Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order (DN #50 ). Defendants' Joint Response to Plaintiff's Objection to Magistrate Judge's Order is deemed timely filed. cc: Counsel (CDF)
January 24, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE Notice of Filing by Beth A. Lynch, Andrea K. Savidge re #55 Response to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit G, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit H) (Jannace, Peter)
January 23, 2019 Filing 55 RESPONSE to Motion re #51 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Beth A. Lynch, Andrea K. Savidge. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Plaintiffs' Proposed Order) (Jannace, Peter) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2019: #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit G, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit H) (MEJ).
January 17, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE by Neil Medical Group, Inc., Pharm-Save, Inc. re #53 MOTION for Leave to (Miller, Byron)
January 16, 2019 Filing 58 DEFENDANTS PHARM-SAVE, INC. AND NEIL MEDICAL GROUP, INC.'S JOINT RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER, re #50 Objection to #49 Order on Motion for Protective Order, filed by Neil Medical Group, Inc., Pharm-Save, Inc. (CDF)
January 16, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION for Leave to file Joint Response by Defendants Neil Medical Group, Inc., Pharm-Save, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Response, #2 Proposed Order) (Miller, Byron) Modified on 1/17/2019 to clarify (RLJ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/17/2019) (MEJ).
January 14, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel by Neil Medical Group, Inc., Pharm-Save, Inc. (Denham, Mitchel)
January 2, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Neil Medical Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Miller, Byron)
December 28, 2018 Filing 50 Objection to #49 Order on Motion for Protective Order filed by Beth A. Lynch, Andrea K. Savidge. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Kitchen Cafe v. Wolfgang Puck Licensing, LLC) (Jannace, Peter)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 12/14/2018, GRANTING #35 Motion for Protective Order. Defendants are now permitted to refile their Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction under Rule 12(b)(2). cc: Counsel(RLK)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER SUSTAINING OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATE'S ORDER by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 9/24/2018 - The Joint Motion to Reconsider Magistrate Judge's Order Denying Agreed Motion For Protective Order [R. 44] is SUSTAINED and the Order of the Magistrate [R. 43] is VACATED. The defendants' Joint Motion for Protective Order [R. 35], the plaintiff's response thereto [R. 37], and the defendant's reply [R. 39] SHALL BE submitted to Magistrate Judge Edwards for resolution. Defendant Neil Medical Group, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction [R. 36] is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE with leave to refile pending the resolution of [R. 35] by Magistrate Judge Edwards. cc: Counsel, USMJ Edwards-CM(DAK)
August 17, 2018 Filing 47 REPLY re #44 Joint MOTION for Reconsideration re #43 Order on Motion for Protective Order filed by Pharm-Save, Inc.. (Miller, Byron)
August 6, 2018 Filing 46 RESPONSE to Motion re #44 Joint MOTION for Reconsideration re #43 Order on Motion for Protective Order filed by Beth A. Lynch, Andrea K. Savidge. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Tendered Order, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit F, #3 Supplement Eichbauer v. Henry Ford Health Sys., #4 Supplement Guiden v. Leatt Corp., #5 Supplement SBAV LP v. Porter Bancorp, Inc., #6 Supplement Albritton v. CVS Caremark Corp., #7 Supplement Grissom v. Ill. Cent. R.R. Co., #8 Supplement Pinkerton's Inc. v. Shelly Pinkerton Corp., #9 Supplement JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. v. Neovi, Inc., #10 Supplement Altman v. Grant Cnty. Sch. Dist., #11 Supplement McGhee v. Country Fresh, LLC) (Jannace, Peter)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr., Pursuant to GO 2018-08, Case referred to United States Magistrate Judge Edwards. Case no longer referred to United States Magistrate Whalin. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (KJA)
July 23, 2018 Filing 44 Joint MOTION for Reconsideration re #43 Order Denying Agreed Motion for Protective Order, and OBJECTIONS to Magistrate Judge's #43 Order Denying Agreed Motion for Protective Order. by Defendants Neil Medical Group, Inc., and Pharm-Save, Inc. (Miller, Byron) Modified on 7/24/2018: added objection language (RLK).
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 VACATED per #48 - ORDER by Magistrate Judge Dave Whalin on 7/9/2018 - #35 Motion for Protective Order is DENIED. cc: Counsel(DAK) Modified on 9/26/2018: vacated (RLK).
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 TEXT ORDER by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 6/29/2018. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court REFERS this case to United States Magistrate Judge Dave Whalin for purposes of: 1) resolving all non-dispositive pretrial motions; 2) generally managing discovery, including resolving all discovery disputes and conducting any hearing(s) other than the pretrial conference; 3) generally managing all pretrial scheduling issues, including altering any dates and/or deadlines, except deadlines for dispositive/Daubert motions, and the pretrial conference and the trial deadlines; 4) conducting a mid-discovery telephonic conference; and 5) conducting a settlement conference, if requested by the parties. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel, Magistrate Judge Whalin's CM (RLK)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 TEXT ORDER by Chief Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr., Pursuant to GO 2018-03, Case reassigned to Judge Claria H. Boom for all further proceedings. Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell no longer assigned to case. cc:counsel (MLG)
March 21, 2018 Filing 40 REPLY to Response to Motion re #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Neil Medical Group, Inc.. (Miller, Byron)
March 20, 2018 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to Motion re #35 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Neil Medical Group, Inc., Pharm-Save, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Plfs' Early Rule 34 Requests to Defs) (Miller, Byron)
March 7, 2018 Filing 38 RESPONSE to Motion re #36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Beth A. Lynch, Andrea K. Savidge. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Tendered Order, #2 Supplement Blanchard v. Britthaven, Inc.) (Jannace, Peter)
March 6, 2018 Filing 37 RESPONSE to Motion re #35 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Beth A. Lynch, Andrea K. Savidge. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Tendered Order, #2 Supplement Culver v. Wilson, #3 Supplement Mikron v. Hurd, #4 Supplement Silvestro v. EBI) (Jannace, Peter)
February 14, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Neil Medical Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A: Affidavit of Erik Lindberg, #3 Proposed Order) (Miller, Byron)
February 13, 2018 Filing 35 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants Neil Medical Group, Inc., Pharm-Save, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Plfs' 1st Set of Discovery to Pharm-Save, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B: Plfs' 1st Set of Discovery to Neil Medical, #3 Proposed Order) (Miller, Byron) Modified on 9/26/2018: reopened per #48 (RLK).
January 19, 2018 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Motion re #30 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Neil Medical Group, Inc., Pharm-Save, Inc.. (Miller, Byron)
January 5, 2018 Filing 33 RESPONSE to Motion re #30 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Beth A. Lynch, Andrea K. Savidge. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Tendered Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit Exhibit E, #4 Supplement unpublished case law, #5 Supplement unpublished case law, #6 Supplement unpublished case law) (Jannace, Peter)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 12/22/2017 granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Defendant Pharm-Save, Inc. shall file an Answer to Plaintiffs Verified Complaint no later than fifteen (15) days after the Court has had occasion to rule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Defendant Neil Medical Group, Inc., if not dismissed based upon its forthcoming Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, shall file an Answer to Plaintiffs' Verified Complaint no later than fifteen (15) days after the Court has had occasion to rule on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. cc: Counsel (JM)
December 22, 2017 Filing 31 RESPONSE to Motion re #29 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #27 Amended Complaint filed by Beth A. Lynch, Andrea K. Savidge. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order tendered order, #2 Supplement unpublished case law) (Jannace, Peter)
December 15, 2017 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Class Action Complaint by Defendants Neil Medical Group, Inc., Pharm-Save, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Miller, Byron)
December 15, 2017 Filing 29 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #27 Amended Complaint by Defendants Neil Medical Group, Inc., Pharm-Save, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Miller, Byron)
December 1, 2017 Filing 28 SURREPLY re #18 Joint MOTION to Stay filed by Neil Medical Group, Inc., Pharm-Save, Inc.. (JBM)
December 1, 2017 Filing 27 FIRST AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Neil Medical Group, Inc., Pharm-Save, Inc., filed by Andrea K. Savidge, Beth A. Lynch. (JBM)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell on 12/1/2017: Defendants' Motion #5 to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED INPART; The parties have until 1/31/2018 to conduct limited discovery on the issue of personal jurisdiction. Thereafter, Defendants have leave to refile their motion to dismiss Neil Medical Group, Inc. under Rule 12(b)(2). Plaintiffs' Joint Motion #8 for Extension of Time to File Response as to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED; Plaintiffs' Joint Motion #11 to Remand is DENIED AS MOOT; Plaintiffs' Motion #7 for Leave to File First Amended Class Action Complaint is GRANTED. Defendants will hereafter be permitted to file another motion to dismiss addressing Plaintiffs' new claims; Plaintiffs' Joint Motion #18 to Stay is DENIED; Defendants' Motion #23 for Leave to File Sur-Reply is GRANTED. cc: Counsel (JBM)
October 24, 2017 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply In Support of filed by Neil Medical Group, Inc., Pharm-Save, Inc.. (Miller, Byron)
October 10, 2017 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion re #23 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by Beth A. Lynch and Andrea K. Savidge. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Supplement Unpublished Opinion) (Jannace, Peter) Modified on 10/11/2017 to edit docket text and change entry relationships (MNM).
September 19, 2017 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Defendants Neil Medical Group, Inc., Pharm-Save, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Davies v. Trigg Cnty., #2 First Tech. Capital, Inc. v. BancTec, Inc., #3 Rose v. Liberty Life Assur. Co., #4 Reply Defendants Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion to Deny or Stay, #5 Babcock Power, Inc. v. Sterling Grp., LP, #6 Schall v. Suzuki Motor of Am., Inc., #7 Mattson v. Troyer, #8 Proposed Order) (Miller, Byron)
September 13, 2017 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Beth A. Lynch, Andrea K. Savidge. (Jannace, Peter)
September 12, 2017 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #18 Joint MOTION to Stay re #9 Proposed Order, #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Beth A. Lynch, Andrea K. Savidge. (Attachments: #1 Supplement unpublished decision) (Jannace, Peter)
August 31, 2017 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 Joint MOTION to Stay re #9 Proposed Order, #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Neil Medical Group, Inc., Pharm-Save, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Babcock Power, Inc. v. Sterling Grp., LP) (Miller, Byron)
August 31, 2017 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #17 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Neil Medical Group, Inc., Pharm-Save, Inc.. (Miller, Byron)
August 11, 2017 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Stay re #9 Proposed Order, #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Plaintiffs Beth A. Lynch, Andrea K. Savidge (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Authority in Support, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Peter J. Jannace, #3 Proposed Order Tendered Order, #4 Exhibit unpublished decision) (Jannace, Peter)
August 10, 2017 Filing 17 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal, by Plaintiffs Beth A. Lynch, Andrea K. Savidge (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Authority in Support, #2 Exhibit First Amended Class Action Complaint, #3 Proposed Order Tendered Order, #4 Exhibit unpublished decision) (Jannace, Peter)
May 31, 2017 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 Joint MOTION to Remand filed by Beth A. Lynch, Andrea K. Savidge. (Jannace, Peter)
May 18, 2017 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Neil Medical Group, Inc., Pharm-Save, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Holmes v. Countrywide Fin. Corp., #2 Nance v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.) (Miller, Byron)
May 18, 2017 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 Joint MOTION to Remand filed by Neil Medical Group, Inc., Pharm-Save, Inc.. (Miller, Byron)
May 4, 2017 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Beth A. Lynch, Andrea K. Savidge. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Tendered Order, #2 Supplement unpublished decision, #3 Supplement unpublished decision, #4 Supplement unpublished decision, #5 Supplement unpublished decision) (Jannace, Peter)
April 27, 2017 Filing 12 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Article III Standing Argument from Motion to Dismiss by Neil Medical Group, Inc., Pharm-Save, Inc. re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Miller, Byron)
April 26, 2017 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Remand by Plaintiffs Beth A. Lynch, Andrea K. Savidge (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Jannace, Peter)
April 14, 2017 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Neil Medical Group, Inc., Pharm-Save, Inc.. (Miller, Byron)
April 10, 2017 Filing 9 Proposed Order re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Neil Medical Group, Inc., Pharm-Save, Inc.. (Miller, Byron)
April 9, 2017 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Plaintiffs Beth A. Lynch, Andrea K. Savidge (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Jannace, Peter)
March 27, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE to Jefferson Circuit Court Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: counsel (MNM)
March 27, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE of Deficiency re #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Reason for Deficiency: Proposed Order Not Submitted. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 4/3/2017. (MNM)
March 27, 2017 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Neil Medical Group, Inc. and Pharm-Save, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit of Lindberg, #3 Case Law) (MNM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/10/2017: #4 Proposed Order) (KJA).
March 27, 2017 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Hillco, Ltd for Pharm-Save, Inc. (MNM)
March 27, 2017 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Britthaven, Inc. for Neil Medical Group, Inc. (MNM)
March 27, 2017 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Thomas B. Russell. Magistrate Judge designation: Magistrate Judge Dave Whalin. (MNM)
March 27, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Pharm-Save, Inc. and Neil Medical Group, Inc. from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 17-CI-001134 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2409384). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Notice and Certificate of Removal, #3 Cover Sheet) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Savidge et al v. Pharm-Save, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Savidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beth A. Lynch
Represented By: Teddy B. Gordon
Represented By: Peter J. Jannace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea K. Savidge
Represented By: Teddy B. Gordon
Represented By: Peter J. Jannace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharm-Save, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Medical Group, Inc.
Represented By: Adam B. Shadburne
Represented By: Mitchel Terence Denham
Represented By: Michael J. Bender
Represented By: Joseph A. Wright
Represented By: Byron N. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharm-Save, Inc.
Represented By: Adam B. Shadburne
Represented By: Mitchel Terence Denham
Represented By: Michael J. Bender
Represented By: Joseph A. Wright
Represented By: Byron N. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?