USLMC, LLC v. Nova Health RT
Plaintiff: USLMC, LLC
Defendant: Nova Health RT
Case Number: 3:2018cv00544
Filed: August 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Office: Louisville Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Charles R Simpson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AGREED ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 10/5/2018 - The Rule 26 Meeting And Report is postponed indefinitely until the Court rules on the pending Motion. cc:counsel (DAK)
October 3, 2018 Filing 14 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by USLMC, LLC. (Cox, Jared)
September 20, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Non-Electronic Document by USLMC, LLC. (DAK)
September 20, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing by USLMC, LLC re #11 Reply to Response to Motion (Cox, Jared)
September 20, 2018 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand or Strike filed by USLMC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - CD filed conventionally with the Court) (Cox, Jared)
September 10, 2018 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand or Strike filed by Nova Health RT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A - Order of 08-14-18, #2 Exhibit Exh B - Order of 08-14-18 #2, #3 Exhibit Exh C - Sazerac Brands 6th Cir. Opinion) (Cox, Donald)
August 31, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand or Strike by Plaintiff USLMC, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Motion to Set Aside, #2 Exhibit B-Order denying, #3 Exhibit C-Docket, #4 Exhibit D-Response to Motion to Set Aside, #5 Proposed Order) (Cox, Jared)
August 27, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE to re #5 Order Dated August 16, 2018 filed by Nova Health RT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - SOS printout, #3 Exhibit C - SOS printout, #4 Exhibit D SOS printout, #5 Exhibit E - KY Board of Medical Licensure Newsletter, #6 Exhibit F - BBB Louisville Men's Clinic, #7 Exhibit G - BBB Nova Health, #8 Exhibit H - Internet Ad from Nova Health, #9 Exhibit I - Nova Health website page, #10 Exhibit J - US Patent & Trademark printout on Men's Clinics of America, #11 Exhibit K - What is a Men's Health Clinic from Internet, #12 Exhibit L - 2Internet infor on number of men's health clinics) (Cox, Donald)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 8/24/2018: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/5/2018. cc: counsel (JM)
August 23, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Nova Health RT. (Cox, Donald)
August 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 8/14/2018 - Defendant SHALL re-file the applicable pending motion that needs to be addressed by this Court on or before August 27, 2018. cc:counsel (DAK)
August 14, 2018 Filing 4 CLERK NOTICE LETTER sent to Jefferson Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (VS)
August 14, 2018 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. Magistrate Judge designation: Judge Colin H. Lindsay. (VS)
August 13, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Nova Health RT. (VS)
August 13, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nova Health RT from Jefferson Circuit Court, Case Number 18-CI-04047, filed by Nova Health RT. ( Filing fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0644-2694817). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Circuit Court Pleadings, #2 Cover Sheet) (VS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USLMC, LLC v. Nova Health RT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USLMC, LLC
Represented By: Kyle W. Miller
Represented By: Jared A. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nova Health RT
Represented By: Donald L. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?