Andrews v. Jordon et al
Plaintiff: Jared Andrews
Defendant: John Doe and Scott Jordon
Case Number: 3:2018cv00606
Filed: September 11, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2018 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Scott Jordon, filed by Jared Andrews. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (JM)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 10/4/2018: Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint on this Court's approved 1983 complaint form and tender a summons form for any newly named Defendant within 30 days of entry of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff a 1983 complaint form with the instant civil action number and amended affixed to the caption, along with three summons forms. Failure to comply with this Order within the time allotted will result in DISMISSAL of the instant action. cc: Plaintiff (pro se) w/ forms (JM)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE (EBOC) Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 10/3/2018 granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Northpoint Training Center to collect filing fee from inmate trust account. Clerk to open account for receipt of filing fee payment. cc: Plaintiff (Pro se), Finance, NTC- Inmate Accounts (JM)
September 11, 2018 Filing 8 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. Magistrate Judge designation: Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. (JM)
September 11, 2018 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Kentucky Eastern; Case Number 5:18-cv-00522. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (JM)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: 1) Clerk shall TRANSFER this case to the Louisville Division of the USDC for KYWD. 2) Pla's #2 motion to proceed IFP is DEFERRED for resolution by the transferee court. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 9/11/2018.(SCD)cc: Pro Se Pla via US Mail [Transferred from kyed on 9/11/2018.]
September 6, 2018 Filing 5 IMPORTANT NOTICE to Pro Se Filer: Information relating to pro se filings and F.R.Civ.P. 5.2 requiring personal identifiers be partially redacted from documents filed with the court. #Click here for more information on the rules. It is the sole responsibility of counsel and the parties to comply with the rules requiring redaction of personal data identifiers.cc: pro se filer via U.S. Mail (Attachments: #1 Sample Caption)(KJR) [Transferred from kyed on 9/11/2018.]
September 6, 2018 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jared Andrews. (KJR) [Transferred from kyed on 9/11/2018.]
September 6, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jared Andrews (pro se). Motions referred to P SO. (KJR) [Transferred from kyed on 9/11/2018.]
September 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT referred to Judge P SO., filed by Jared Andrews (pro se_. (Attachments: #1 Exhaustion of Admin Remedies, #2 env no postmark)(KJR) [Transferred from kyed on 9/11/2018.]
September 6, 2018 Conflict Check run. (KJR) [Transferred from kyed on 9/11/2018.]
September 6, 2018 ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of PSO for review: re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jared Andrews (KJR) [Transferred from kyed on 9/11/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrews v. Jordon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jared Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Jordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?