Chattanooga Hotmix, Inc. v. Astec Industries, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Chattanooga Hotmix, Inc.
Defendant: Astec, Inc. and Astec Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00679
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: Kentucky Western District Court
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Chattanooga Hotmix, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Michael Mercer) (Rousseau, Liane)
November 26, 2018 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chattanooga Hotmix, Inc.. (Mattingly, Stephen)
November 19, 2018 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Astec Industries, Inc. for Astec Industries, Inc., Astec, Inc.. by Astec Industries, Inc., Astec, Inc.. (Jackson, John)
November 19, 2018 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Astec Industries, Inc., Astec, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit 1 - website printout of www.chattanoogahotmix.com, #3 Proposed Order for Motion to Dismiss) (Jackson, John)
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order 11 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 11/16/2018 granting #8 Motion for John G. Jackson to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #9 Motion for April L. Besl to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #10 Motion for Liane H. Rousseau to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(NWT)
November 15, 2018 10 MOTION for Liane H. Rousseau to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2753175. by Plaintiff Chattanooga Hotmix, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Liane H. Rousseau, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Mattingly, Stephen)
November 15, 2018 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of April L. Besl Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2753151. by Plaintiff Chattanooga Hotmix, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of April L. Besl, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Mattingly, Stephen)
November 14, 2018 8 MOTION for John G. Jackson to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2751542. by Defendants Astec Industries, Inc., Astec, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (Jackson, John)
November 5, 2018 7 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency for Liane H. Rousseau re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/23/2018. (KJA)
November 5, 2018 6 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency for April L. Besl re #1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 11/23/2018. (KJA)
October 24, 2018 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Astec Industries, Inc. and Astec, Inc. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued Summonses. (VS)
October 16, 2018 4 NOTICE of Filing Summonses by Chattanooga Hotmix, Inc. re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (Mattingly, Stephen)
October 16, 2018 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re no Summonses were tendered with #1 Complaint. (VS)
October 16, 2018 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. Magistrate Judge designation: Judge Lanny King. (VS)
October 15, 2018 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Astec Industries, Inc. and Astec, Inc., filed by Chattanooga Hotmix, Inc. (Filing Fee $400.00, Receipt Number 0644-2734126). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cease and Desist Letter, #2 Exhibit B - Articles of Incorporation, #3 Cover Sheet). Emailed attested copy of the Complaint to Plaintiff's Counsel. (VS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chattanooga Hotmix, Inc. v. Astec Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astec, Inc.
Represented By: John G. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astec Industries, Inc.
Represented By: John G. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chattanooga Hotmix, Inc.
Represented By: Donna King Perry
Represented By: April L. Besl
Represented By: Stephen J. Mattingly
Represented By: Liane H. Rousseau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?