South Side Quarry, LLC et al v. Metropolitan Sewer District et al
Plaintiff: South Side Quarry, LLC and Jason Lee Stanford
Defendant: Metropolitan Sewer District, Andy Beshear, Attorney General Commonwealth of Kentucky and Andy Beshear
Case Number: 3:2018cv00706
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1251
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Metropolitan Sewer District (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - USACE Feasibility Report excerpts, #3 Exhibit 2 - Aerial Photo of Vulcan Quarry, #4 Exhibit 3 - Project Cooperation Agreement, #5 Exhibit 4 - Operation Manual, #6 Exhibit 5 - March 20, 1998 Hearing Transcript, #7 Exhibit 6 - Certificate of Easements, #8 Exhibit 7 - Stream Construction Permit, #9 Exhibit 8 - USACE Determination of Impoundment, #10 Exhibit 9 - MFWTP Permit KY0022411 1999, #11 Exhibit 10 - MS4 Permit 2017-2022, #12 Exhibit 11 - Consent Decree & Amended Consent Decree, #13 Exhibit 12 - 2013 Jefferson Circuit Court proceedings, #14 Proposed Order) (Schaefer, Christopher)
December 21, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Defendant Metropolitan Sewer District (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Schaefer, Christopher)
December 10, 2018 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by South Side Quarry, LLC, Jason Lee Stanford. (Cox, John)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 12/3/2018. Defendant Louisville/Jefferson County Metropolitan Sewer District has until 12/21/2018, to file an answer, motion, or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this matter, re #1 Complaint. cc: Counsel (CDF)
November 21, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Andy Beshear (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order Order) (Payne, Taylor)
November 16, 2018 Filing 6 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Metropolitan Sewer District. (Schaefer, Christopher)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed/Unexecuted as to Commonwealth of Kentucky., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Lee Stanford, South Side Quarry, LLC. Andy Beshear served on 11/2/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Cox, John)
November 6, 2018 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed/Unexecuted as to Metropolitan Sewer District., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Lee Stanford, South Side Quarry, LLC. Metropolitan Sewer District served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (Cox, John)
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Andy Beshear, Attorney General Commonwealth of Kentucky, and Metropolitan Sewer District. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued Summonses. (VS)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. Magistrate Judge designation: Judge Regina S. Edwards. (VS)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, CIVIL PENALTIES, AND DAMAGES against Metropolitan Sewer District and Andy Beshear, Attorney General Commonwealth of Kentucky, filed by South Side Quarry, LLC and Jason Lee Stanford. (Filing Fee $400.00, Receipt Number 0644-2741663). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment 1 - Notice Letter, #2 Exhibit Attachment 2 - Construction Drawings, #3 Exhibit Attachment 3 - Photos Collapsed Easement, #4 Tendered Summons, #5 Cover Sheet). (VS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: South Side Quarry, LLC et al v. Metropolitan Sewer District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Side Quarry, LLC
Represented By: Petersen S. Thomas
Represented By: John D. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Lee Stanford
Represented By: Petersen S. Thomas
Represented By: John D. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Sewer District
Represented By: Christopher E. Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Beshear, Attorney General Commonwealth of Kentucky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Beshear
Represented By: Taylor A, Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?