Hull v. Rawlings Company LLC
Plaintiff: Ona Hull
Defendant: Rawlings Company LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00772
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Greg N Stivers
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 fm
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Rawlings Company LLC (Hamilton, Shannon)
January 7, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Rawlings Company LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A-Email from Hull to Rawlings, #3 Exhibit B-McDonald v. UAW-GM Center for Human Resources (unpublished), #4 Proposed Order) (Srinivasan, Kalpana) Modified to edit document descriptions on 1/8/2019 (JWM).
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 1/4/2019 granting #8 Motion for Kalpana Srinivasan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel(JWM)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AGREED ORDER EXTENDING PLAINTIFF'S TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 12/27/2018 re #14 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation. Plaintiff shall have through 1/7/2019 to file her response. cc:counsel; Kalpana Srinivasan; Lora J. Krsulich (JWM)
December 27, 2018 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #15 Notice (Other) ; Error:Incorrect Docketing Event Selected; Correction:Docketed by Clerk Using Correct Event (See DN #16 ). Filer notified of correct filing event for future filings (JWM)
December 24, 2018 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rawlings Company LLC, filed by Ona Hull. (JWM)
December 24, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed R Civ P 15(a)(1) by Ona Hull (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint) (Smith, Robyn)
December 21, 2018 Filing 14 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Ona Hull. (Abney, Paul)
December 21, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Supplemental Affidavit of Kalpana Srinivasan by Rawlings Company LLC re #8 MOTION for Kalpana Srinivasan to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2766612. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Kalpana Srinivasan) (Hamilton, Shannon)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 12/19/2018 granting #7 Motion for Lora J. Krsulich to Appear Pro Hac Vice cc: Counsel; Lora J. Krsulich; Kalpana Srinivasan(JWM)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Chief Judge Greg N. Stivers on 12/19/2018 granting #6 Motion for Shawn J. Rabin to Appear Pro Hac Vice cc: Counsel; Lora J. Krsulich; Kalpana Srinivasan(JWM)
December 17, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Supplemental Affidavit of Lora Krsulich by Rawlings Company LLC re #7 MOTION for Lora J. Krsulich to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2766473. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Supplemental Affidavit of Lora Krsulich) (Hamilton, Shannon)
December 17, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Supplemental Affidavit for Shawn Rabin by Rawlings Company LLC re #6 MOTION for Shawn J. Rabin to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2766449. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Supplemental Affidavit of Shawn Rabin) (Hamilton, Shannon)
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Kalpana Srinivasan to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2766612. by Defendant Rawlings Company LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kalpana Srinivasan, #2 Certificate of Good Standing for Kalpana Srinivasan, #3 Proposed Order) (Hamilton, Shannon) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/27/2018: #4 Affidavit (Supplemental)) (JWM).
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Lora J. Krsulich to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2766473. by Defendant Rawlings Company LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Lora J. Krsulich, #2 Certificate of Good Standing for Lora J. Krsulich, #3 Proposed Order) (Hamilton, Shannon) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/18/2018: #4 Affidavit Supplemental) (JWM).
December 11, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Shawn J. Rabin to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2766449. by Defendant Rawlings Company LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Shawn J. Rabin, #2 Certificate of Good Standing for Shawn J. Rabin, #3 Proposed Order) (Hamilton, Shannon) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/18/2018: #4 Affidavit Supplemental) (JWM).
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Rawlings Company LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - Resignation Email, #3 Proposed Order) (Hamilton, Shannon)
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL re #1 Notice of Removal from Oldham Circuit Court, Civil Action Number 18-CI-00650. cc: Counsel; Oldham Circuit Court (JWM)
November 26, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rawlings Company LLC. (JWM)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Greg N. Stivers. Magistrate Judge designation: Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. (JWM)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Rawlings Company LLC from Oldham Circuit Court, Case Number 18-CI-00650. ( Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 0644-2757626 ) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint Filed in Oldham Circuit Court, #2 Exhibit B-Documents Filed in Oldham Circuit Court Matter, #3 Exhibit C-Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Cover Sheet) (JWM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hull v. Rawlings Company LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rawlings Company LLC
Represented By: Ashley O. Hopkins
Represented By: Shannon Antle Hamilton
Represented By: Lora J. Krsulich
Represented By: Shawn J. Rabin
Represented By: Kalpana Srinivasan
Represented By: Robin E. McGuffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ona Hull
Represented By: Soha T. Saiyed
Represented By: Kelly M. Parry
Represented By: Paul S. Abney
Represented By: Jeremiah W. Reece
Represented By: Robyn R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?