Peak v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Jason Peak
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and Greg Vincent Insurance Agency, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00851
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 2/20/2019 granting #8 Motion to Seal Document. The documents shall remain sealed unless and until they become publicly available or de-designated as Confidential under the existing Protective Order or by any Orderof this Court. cc: Counsel(RLJ)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 2/20/2019. Pursuant to Rule 41, the Defendant Greg Vincent is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs. cc: Counsel (MEJ)
February 19, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Greg Vincent Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) by Jason Peak. (Aguiar, Sam)
February 14, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Plaintiff Jason Peak (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D) (Aguiar, Sam)
February 14, 2019 Filing 20 Sealed Document re #8 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Klapheke, David)
February 14, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION for Leave to Seal Document filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Klapheke, David)
February 14, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreed Protective Order, #2 Proposed Order) (Klapheke, David)
February 14, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Stay re #11 MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Jason Peak (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Natale, Christina)
February 14, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Police Report, #2 Exhibit B - State Farm Letter, #3 Exhibit C - Court of Appeals Cite, #4 Proposed Order) (Klapheke, David)
February 12, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Jason Peak re #14 Response to Motion (Attachments: #1 Response, #2 Proposed Order) (Natale, Christina)
February 12, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Jason Peak. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Natale, Christina) (Main Document 14 replaced on 2/13/2019) (MEJ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/13/2019) (MEJ).
January 28, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED DOCUMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Amendment to #12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Klapheke, David)
January 24, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Klapheke, David)
January 24, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Greg Vincent Insurance Agency, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Banks, Darrin)
January 24, 2019 Filing 10 Sealed Document re #8 (Natale, Christina)
January 24, 2019 Filing 9 Sealed Document re #8 (Natale, Christina)
January 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Seal Document by Plaintiff Jason Peak (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order) (Natale, Christina)
January 24, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Jason Peak (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Natale, Christina)
January 4, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Greg Vincent Insurance Agency, Inc.. (Banks, Darrin)
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED PLEADING by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company re #2 MOTION to Stay (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Klapheke, David)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (DJT)
December 26, 2018 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (DJT)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (DJT)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (DJT)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [ANSWER FILED] by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-6524. Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-2774232, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Record) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peak v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: David T. Klapheke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Vincent Insurance Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Darrin W. Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Peak
Represented By: Jasper D. Ward, IV
Represented By: Christina T. Natale
Represented By: Sam Aguiar
Represented By: Laura J. Thomas
Represented By: Abigale R. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?