Carter v. Nord et al
Plaintiff: Davon Carter
Defendant: The Secret Service and Richard H. Nord
Case Number: 3:2019cv00018
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Davon Carter. The Secret Service served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Receipt The Secret Service) (White, J.)
January 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Davon Carter. Richard H. Nord served on 1/14/2019, answer due 2/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Receipt Richard Nord) (White, J.)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed/Unexecuted as to The Secret Service. (White, J.)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed/Unexecuted as to Richard Nord. (White, J.)
January 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Amended Coversheet by Davon Carter (White, J.)
January 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summonses Issued as to Richard H. Nord, The Secret Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (JWM)
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (JWM)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Richard H. Nord, The Secret Service, filed by Davon Carter. Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 0644-2780027. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (JWM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/11/2019: #3 Cover Sheet) (DAK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Nord et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davon Carter
Represented By: J. Andrew White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Secret Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard H. Nord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?