Greer v. Papa John's International, Inc.

Plaintiff: Jamiah Greer
Defendant: Papa John's International, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00025
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 Signed by Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 1/28/2019 granting Motion to Consolidate Cases and to Appoint Interim Co-Lead Counsel. Page v. Papa Johns Int'l, Case No. 3:18-cv-835-CHB and Greer v. Papa John's Int'l, Case No. 3:19-cv-00025-RGJ, are transferred and reassigned to the undersigned Judge and consolidated into Houston v. Papa John's Int'l, Case No. 3:18-cv-00825-JHM-RSE (the "Master File") (the consolidated actions are referred to herein as the "Consolidated Action"). An original of this Order shall be filed by the Clerk in the Master File and on the individual dockets for the Page and Greer actions. The individual Page and Greer actions at 3:18-cv-835-CHB and 3:19-cv-00025-RGJ, respectively, shall thereafter be closed. The Consolidated Action is re-captioned: In Re: Papa John's Employee and Franchisee Employee Antitrust Litigation, No. 3:18-cv-00825-JHM-RSE. The law firms of McCune Wright Arevalo, LLP, Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, Lowey Dannenberg, P.C., and Scott+Scott Attorneys at Law LLP are hereby appointed as Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel for the Consolidated Action; The Moore Law Group is appointed as Liaison Counsel and Radice Law Firm is appointed as Interim Counsel. They will assist in representation of plaintiffs and the proposed class as requested by Interim Co-Lead Counsel. Plaintiffs must file a consolidated amended class action complaint ("CAC") Within 21 days after the appointment of Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel; Defendants' responses to the CAC due 45 days after the filing of the CAC; Plaintiffs' opposition to any motions to dismiss due 45 days after Defendants' responses Defendants' replies in support of any motions to dismiss due 30 days after Plaintiffs' opposition. (a copy of this order has been docketed in 3:18cv-835-CHB and 3:19cv-00025-RGJ) cc: Counsel(JM)
January 25, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Appoint Interim Co-Lead Counsel by Plaintiff Jamiah Greer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Walter W. Noss, #2 Proposed Order) (Moore, Jennifer)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 1/25/2019 granting #21 Motion for Attorney Gerald L. Maatman, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
January 15, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Gerald L. Maatman, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2785836. by Defendant Papa John's International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit GLM - Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit G Maatman Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order Proposed ORDER GRANTING G. Maatman Pro Hac Motion) (Monhollen, Phillip)
January 15, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Phillip L. Monhollen on behalf of Papa John's International, Inc. (Monhollen, Phillip)
January 9, 2019 Filing 19 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency addressed to Attorney Roland Raymond St. Louis, III. Reason for Deficiency: Attorney not admitted to the WDKY. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 2/23/2019. (JM)
January 9, 2019 Filing 18 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency addressed to Attorney Gerald L. Maatman, Jr.. Reason for deficiency: Attorney not admitted to the WDKY. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 2/23/2019. (JM)
January 9, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency addressed to Attorney Christian Levis. Reason for deficiency: Attorney not admitted to the WDKY. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 2/23/2019. (JM)
January 9, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency addressed to Attorney Vincent Briganti. Reason for deficiency: Attorney not admitted to the WDKY. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 2/23/2019. (JM)
January 9, 2019 Filing 15 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (JM)
January 9, 2019 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-11312. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (JM)
January 9, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Western District of Kentucky (mro) [Transferred from nysd on 1/9/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, AGREED, AND ORDERED, that this action is transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Kentucky pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/9/2019) (mro) [Transferred from nysd on 1/9/2019.]
January 8, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Vincent Briganti dated January 8, 2019 re: Request to transfer. Document filed by Jamiah Greer. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Stipulation and Order)(Briganti, Vincent) [Transferred from nysd on 1/9/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 3/22/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (jwh) [Transferred from nysd on 1/9/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Time to answer or move is extended to March 4, 2019. The February 12 conference is adjourned to March 22, 2019 at 10:30am. (Papa John's International, Inc. answer due 3/4/2019.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/3/2019) (jwh) [Transferred from nysd on 1/9/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and for an adjournment of the Initial Pre-Trial Conference addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Gerald L. Maatman Jr. dated January 3, 2019. Document filed by Papa John's International, Inc..(Maatman, Gerald) [Transferred from nysd on 1/9/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Papa John's International, Inc..(Maatman, Gerald) [Transferred from nysd on 1/9/2019.]
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gerald Leonard Maatman, Jr on behalf of Papa John's International, Inc.. (Maatman, Gerald) [Transferred from nysd on 1/9/2019.]
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/12/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Richard C. Casey on 12/10/2018) (jwh) [Transferred from nysd on 1/9/2019.]
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Papa John's International, Inc.. (pc) [Transferred from nysd on 1/9/2019.]
December 6, 2018 Case Designated ECF. (pc) [Transferred from nysd on 1/9/2019.]
December 6, 2018 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc) [Transferred from nysd on 1/9/2019.]
December 6, 2018 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc) [Transferred from nysd on 1/9/2019.]
December 6, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Vincent Briganti. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 15:2; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 15:15; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc) [Transferred from nysd on 1/9/2019.]
December 6, 2018 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Vincent Briganti. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Jamiah Greer. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc) [Transferred from nysd on 1/9/2019.]
December 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Roland Raymond St. Louis, III on behalf of Jamiah Greer. (St. Louis, Roland) [Transferred from nysd on 1/9/2019.]
December 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christian Levis on behalf of Jamiah Greer. (Levis, Christian) [Transferred from nysd on 1/9/2019.]
December 5, 2018 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Papa John's International, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jamiah Greer. (Briganti, Vincent) [Transferred from nysd on 1/9/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Briganti, Vincent) [Transferred from nysd on 1/9/2019.]
December 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Papa John's International, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16004474)Document filed by Jamiah Greer.(Briganti, Vincent) [Transferred from nysd on 1/9/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greer v. Papa John's International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamiah Greer
Represented By: Christian Levis
Represented By: Roland Raymond St. Louis, III
Represented By: Vincent Briganti
Represented By: Roland R. St. Louis, III
Represented By: Jennifer A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Papa John's International, Inc.
Represented By: Gerald L. Maatman, Jr.
Represented By: Phillip L. Monhollen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?