Grange Insurance Company v. US Framing, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Grange Insurance Company
Defendant: US Framing, Inc. and US Framing International, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00035
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 3/1/2019: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 4/17/2019 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. The parties shall file, within ten (10) days after the Rule 26(f) conference of parties, a joint status report. cc: counsel (JM)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 2/27/2019; pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards for resolution of all litigation planning issues, a scheduling conference, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. A separate order scheduling the Rule 16 Conference will be issued by the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge Edwards. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel, CM-RSE. (ARM)
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by US Framing International, LLC, US Framing, Inc.. (Thomas, Daniel)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by US Framing International, LLC, US Framing, Inc.. (Thomas, Daniel)
January 22, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grange Insurance Company. US Framing International, LLC served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Steinmetz, Robert)
January 18, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grange Insurance Company. US Framing, Inc. served on 1/16/2019, answer due 2/6/2019. (Steinmetz, Robert)
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Other Affiliate Grange Holdings, Inc., and Other Affiliate Grange Mutual Holding Company for Grange Insurance Company. (KD)
January 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summonses. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to US Framing International, LLC) (KD)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (KD)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400.00, Receipt Number 0644-2785242), filed by Grange Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CGL Policy, #2 Exhibit B - CU Policy, #3 Exhibit C - Statement of Claim and Summary of Damages, #4 Cover Sheet). (KD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grange Insurance Company v. US Framing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Framing, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel B. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Framing International, LLC
Represented By: Daniel B. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grange Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert L. Steinmetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?