Argosy Capital Group III, L.P. et al v. Triangle Capital Corporation

Plaintiff: Frank Seidman, Salem Halifax Capital Partners, L.P., Fran Donato, Cordam Group, LLC and Argosy Capital Group III, L.P.
Defendant: Triangle Capital Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00041
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 1/28/2019. This action stands DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) and is STRICKEN from the Court's active docket. cc: Counsel (MEJ)
January 25, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Fran Donato, Argosy Capital Group III, L.P., Cordam Group, LLC, Salem Halifax Capital Partners, L.P., Frank Seidman (Brice, John)
January 16, 2019 Remark: Case assignment sheet and NEF have been sent to case participants advising of case transfer information. (JM)
January 16, 2019 Filing 49 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney Thaddeus D. Wilson re #41 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/30/2019. (JM)
January 16, 2019 Filing 48 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney Kandis Lynn Kovalsky re #41 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/30/2019. (JM)
January 16, 2019 Filing 47 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney Joshua Epstein re #41 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/30/2019. (JM)
January 16, 2019 Filing 46 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney Israel Dahan re #41 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/30/2019. (JM)
January 16, 2019 Filing 45 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney Gregory Mathews re #41 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/30/2019. (JM)
January 16, 2019 Filing 44 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney Edward Kang re #41 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/30/2019. (JM)
January 16, 2019 Filing 43 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency issued to Attorney Chelsea Jean Corey re #41 Case Transferred In - District Transfer. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/30/2019. (JM)
January 16, 2019 Filing 42 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (JM)
January 16, 2019 Filing 41 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:17-cv-09845. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (JM)
January 9, 2019 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Western District of Kentucky. (kv) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 OPINION AND ORDER re: #20 MOTION to Transfer Case To The United States District Court For The Western District Of Kentucky Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1412 & 1404(a). filed by Triangle Capital Corporation. For reasons set forth above, Triangle's motion to transfer venue is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion, Doc. 20, and to transfer this action to the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Kentucky with a recommendation that the action be referred to the Honorable Alan C. Stout, Bankruptcy Judge. This Opinion and Order closes the action in the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of New York. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 1/9/2019) (kv) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Kandis L. Kovalsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 38 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 8/17/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 37 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 8/17/2018 before Judge Edgardo Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Anita Trombetta, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/5/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/15/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/13/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
August 17, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edgardo Ramos: Pre-Motion Conference held on 8/17/2018. Plaintiff's counsel present. Defendant's counsel present. (jar) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
August 17, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edgardo Ramos: Pre-Motion Conference held on 8/17/2018. Plaintiffs' counsel present. Defendant's counsel present. (jar) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #34 Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference. A pre-motion conference will be held on August 17, 2018 at 10:00 am. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 8/17/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
July 23, 2018 Filing 35 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference in response to letter from Defendants regarding discovery dispute between the parties as to whether a 26(f) conference is appropriate addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Edward T. Kang dated July 23, 2018. Document filed by Argosy Capital Group III, L.P., Cordam Group, LLC, Fran Donato, Salem Halifax Capital Partners, L.P., Frank Seidman.(Kang, Edward) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
July 18, 2018 Filing 34 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference regarding discovery dispute between the parties as to whether a 26(f) conference is appropriate to be held at this time while motion to transfer is pending addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Israel Dahan dated July 18, 2018. Document filed by Triangle Capital Corporation.(Dahan, Israel) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
June 20, 2018 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: #20 MOTION to Transfer Case To The United States District Court For The Western District Of Kentucky Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1412 & 1404(a). - Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Surreply Brief in Further Support of the Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer to the United States District Court for the Western District of Kentucky (permitted per ECF Doc. no.32). Document filed by Triangle Capital Corporation. (Dahan, Israel) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. The application is granted. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 6/20/2018) (anc) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 31 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Response To Plaintiffs' Surreply Brief addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Israel Dahan dated June 19, 2018. Document filed by Triangle Capital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed) Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Surreply Brief in Further Support of the Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer to the United States District Court for the Western District of Kentucky)(Dahan, Israel) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #20 MOTION to Transfer Case To The United States District Court For The Western District Of Kentucky Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1412 & 1404(a)., #27 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Surreply Brief in Further Support of Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Edward T. Kang dated June 15, 2018. . Document filed by Argosy Capital Group III, L.P., Cordam Group, LLC, Fran Donato, Salem Halifax Capital Partners, L.P., Frank Seidman. (Kang, Edward) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #27 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. The application is granted. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 6/18/2018) (mro) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
June 18, 2018 Filing 28 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Israel Dahan dated June 18, 2018 re: #27 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Surreply Brief in Further Support of Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Edward T. Kang dated June 15, 2018. . Document filed by Triangle Capital Corporation. (Dahan, Israel) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
June 15, 2018 Filing 27 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Surreply Brief in Further Support of Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Edward T. Kang dated June 15, 2018. Document filed by Argosy Capital Group III, L.P., Cordam Group, LLC, Fran Donato, Salem Halifax Capital Partners, L.P., Frank Seidman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kang, Edward) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
May 23, 2018 Filing 26 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 2/21/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
May 23, 2018 Filing 25 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 2/21/2018 before Judge Edgardo Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Eve Giniger, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/13/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/25/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/21/2018.(McGuirk, Kelly) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
May 3, 2018 Filing 24 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #20 MOTION to Transfer Case To The United States District Court For The Western District Of Kentucky Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1412 & 1404(a). . Document filed by Triangle Capital Corporation. (Dahan, Israel) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
April 23, 2018 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #20 MOTION to Transfer Case To The United States District Court For The Western District Of Kentucky Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1412 & 1404(a). . Document filed by Argosy Capital Group III, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kang, Edward) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
March 21, 2018 Filing 22 DECLARATION of E. Ashton Poole in Support re: #20 MOTION to Transfer Case To The United States District Court For The Western District Of Kentucky Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1412 & 1404(a).. Document filed by Triangle Capital Corporation. (Dahan, Israel) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
March 21, 2018 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #20 MOTION to Transfer Case To The United States District Court For The Western District Of Kentucky Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1412 & 1404(a). . Document filed by Triangle Capital Corporation. (Dahan, Israel) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
March 21, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to Transfer Case To The United States District Court For The Western District Of Kentucky Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1412 & 1404(a). Document filed by Triangle Capital Corporation.(Dahan, Israel) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
March 15, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #19 MOTION for Kandis Lynn Kovalsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14817032. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
March 15, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for Kandis Lynn Kovalsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14817032. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Argosy Capital Group III, L.P., Cordam Group, LLC, Fran Donato, Salem Halifax Capital Partners, L.P., Frank Seidman.(Kovalsky, Kandis) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Gregory Hunter Mathews to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
March 2, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #17 MOTION for Gregory Hunter Mathews to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14761799. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
March 1, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION for Gregory Hunter Mathews to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14761799. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Argosy Capital Group III, L.P., Cordam Group, LLC, Fran Donato, Salem Halifax Capital Partners, L.P., Frank Seidman.(Mathews, Gregory) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
February 21, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edgardo Ramos: Pre-Motion Conference held on 2/21/2018. Plaintiff's counsel present. Defendant's counsel present. Defendant granted leave to file a motion to transfer with the following briefing schedule: moving papers due March 21, 2018; opposition due April 23,2018; and reply due May 7, 2018. ( Motions due by 3/21/2018., Replies due by 5/7/2018., Responses due by 4/23/2018). (Court Reporter Eve Giniger) (jar) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Thaddeus D. Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
February 16, 2018 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #15 MOTION for Thaddeus D. Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14713002. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
February 16, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Thaddeus D. Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14713002. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Triangle Capital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Wilson, Thaddeus) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
February 16, 2018 Filing 14 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Edward T. Kang dated 2/16/2018 re: Letter Motion of Defendants dated 2/8/18. Document filed by Argosy Capital Group III, L.P., Cordam Group, LLC, Fran Donato, Salem Halifax Capital Partners, L.P., Frank Seidman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Kang, Edward) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion for Conference. A pre-motion conference will be held on February 21, 2018 at 10:30 am. Plaintiff is directed to submit a written response not longer than 3 pages by 5:00 pm Friday, February 16, 2018. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 2/21/2018 at 10:30 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
February 8, 2018 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Conference / Request for Pre-Motion Conference by Defendant as to its Motion to Transfer and Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Israel Dahan dated February 8, 2018. Document filed by Triangle Capital Corporation.(Dahan, Israel) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
February 8, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Israel Dahan on behalf of Triangle Capital Corporation. (Dahan, Israel) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
February 7, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF COUNT III OF THE COMPLAINT: The parties, by and through their undersigned counsel, hereby stipulate that Count III for Breach of Fiduciary Duty in the above-captioned action is dismissed, without prejudice against defendant Triangle Capital Corporation. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 2/7/2018) (mro) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Triangle Capital Corporation answer due 2/9/2018. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (Ramos, Edgardo) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
December 22, 2017 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, or otherwise respond until February 9, 2018 addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Chelsea J. Corey dated December 22, 2017. Document filed by Triangle Capital Corporation.(Corey, Chelsea) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
December 20, 2017 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. Triangle Capital Corporation served on 12/20/2017, answer due 1/10/2018. Service was accepted by Chelsea J. Corey, Esquire, Attorney for Defendant. Document filed by Fran Donato; Argosy Capital Group III, L.P. ; Cordam Group, LLC ; Salem Halifax Capital Partners, L.P. ; Frank Seidman. (Kang, Edward) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
December 20, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward Kang on behalf of Argosy Capital Group III, L.P., Cordam Group, LLC, Fran Donato, Salem Halifax Capital Partners, L.P., Frank Seidman. (Kang, Edward) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
December 19, 2017 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Triangle Capital Corporation. (vf) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
December 18, 2017 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Triangle Capital Corporation, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Argosy Capital Group III, L.P., Cordam Group, LLC, Fran Donato, Salem Halifax Capital Partners, L.P., Frank Seidman. (Epstein, Joshua) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
December 15, 2017 Case Designated ECF. (sj) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
December 15, 2017 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
December 15, 2017 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
December 15, 2017 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joshua H Epstein. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jury Demand code n (None); County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (sj) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
December 15, 2017 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Argosy Capital Group III, L.P., Cordam Group, LLC, Salem Halifax Capital Partners, L.P..(Epstein, Joshua) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
December 15, 2017 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Epstein, Joshua) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]
December 15, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Triangle Capital Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14482659)Document filed by Fran Donato, Argosy Capital Group III, L.P., Cordam Group, LLC, Salem Halifax Capital Partners, L.P., Frank Seidman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Epstein, Joshua) [Transferred from nysd on 1/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Argosy Capital Group III, L.P. et al v. Triangle Capital Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Seidman
Represented By: Gregory Mathews
Represented By: Joshua H Epstein
Represented By: Edward Kang
Represented By: Kandis Lynn Kovalsky
Represented By: John P. Brice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salem Halifax Capital Partners, L.P.
Represented By: Gregory Mathews
Represented By: Joshua H Epstein
Represented By: Edward Kang
Represented By: Kandis Lynn Kovalsky
Represented By: John P. Brice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fran Donato
Represented By: Gregory Mathews
Represented By: Joshua H Epstein
Represented By: Edward Kang
Represented By: Kandis Lynn Kovalsky
Represented By: John P. Brice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cordam Group, LLC
Represented By: Gregory Mathews
Represented By: Joshua H Epstein
Represented By: Edward Kang
Represented By: Kandis Lynn Kovalsky
Represented By: John P. Brice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Argosy Capital Group III, L.P.
Represented By: Gregory Mathews
Represented By: Joshua H Epstein
Represented By: Edward Kang
Represented By: Kandis Lynn Kovalsky
Represented By: John P. Brice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triangle Capital Corporation
Represented By: Israel Dahan
Represented By: Thaddeus D. Wilson
Represented By: Chelsea Jean Corey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?