SECURA Insurance v. Peak Construction, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: SECURA Insurance
Defendant: St. Francis School, Inc., Douglas V. Pierson, Hussung Mechanical Contractors, Inc., Commonwealth Roofing Corp., Duro-Last, Inc., Louisville Panels, LLC, K. Norman Berry Associates, Architects, PLLC, Peak Construction, Inc., (fer) Studio, LLP, BTM Engineering, Inc. and T.C. Peters Construction Co.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00047
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SECURA Insurance. Louisville Panels, LLC waiver sent on 1/28/2019, answer due 3/29/2019. (Nolan, Blake)
March 13, 2019 Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SECURA Insurance. St. Francis School, Inc. waiver sent on 1/28/2019, answer due 3/29/2019. (Nolan, Blake)
March 13, 2019 Filing 35 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SECURA Insurance. BTM Engineering, Inc. waiver sent on 1/28/2019, answer due 3/29/2019. (Nolan, Blake)
March 13, 2019 Filing 34 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SECURA Insurance. Douglas V. Pierson waiver sent on 1/28/2019, answer due 3/29/2019. (Nolan, Blake)
March 13, 2019 Filing 33 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SECURA Insurance. (fer) Studio, LLP waiver sent on 1/28/2019, answer due 3/29/2019. (Nolan, Blake)
March 13, 2019 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SECURA Insurance. Commonwealth Roofing Corp. served on 2/22/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (Nolan, Blake)
March 13, 2019 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SECURA Insurance. K. Norman Berry Associates, Architects, PLLC served on 2/8/2019, answer due 3/1/2019. (Nolan, Blake)
March 13, 2019 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SECURA Insurance. Duro-Last, Inc. served on 2/8/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Nolan, Blake)
March 13, 2019 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SECURA Insurance. Peak Construction, Inc. served on 2/7/2019, answer due 2/28/2019. (Nolan, Blake)
March 8, 2019 Filing 28 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Duro-Last, Inc.. (Keller, Stephen)
March 8, 2019 Filing 27 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Duro-Last, Inc.. (Keller, Stephen)
March 8, 2019 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Peak Construction, Inc.. (Sage, David)
March 8, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Peak Construction, Inc.. (Sage, David)
March 8, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Peak Construction, Inc.. (Sage, David)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 AGREED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Judge David J. Hale - Duro-Last, Inc. shall have an extension of time up to and including March 8, 2019, to file its responsive pleading to Secura's First Amended Complaint. cc: Counsel (KD)
March 1, 2019 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by T.C. Peters Construction Co.. (Tachau, David)
March 1, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant T.C. Peters Construction Co. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 - AIA Document C 132-2009, #3 Proposed Order) (Tachau, David)
March 1, 2019 Filing 20 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation re #7 by Duro-Last, Inc.. (Keller, Stephen)
February 27, 2019 Filing 19 RULE 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Commonwealth Roofing Corp.. (Wiggins, Denis)
February 27, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Commonwealth Roofing Corp.. (Wiggins, Denis)
February 27, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Commonwealth Roofing Corp.. (Wiggins, Denis)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AGREED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Judge David J. Hale on 2/20/2019 - Peters Construction answer due by 3/1/2019. cc:counsel (DAK)
February 19, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Louisville Panels, LLC. (Dawson, Douglas)
February 19, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Louisville Panels, LLC. (Dawson, Douglas)
February 13, 2019 Filing 13 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation re #1 by T.C. Peters Construction Co.. (Tachau, David)
February 7, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BTM Engineering, Inc.. (Baxter, Justin)
February 7, 2019 Filing 11 BTM Engineering, Inc.'s ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint,,,,, by BTM Engineering, Inc.. (Baxter, Justin)
February 1, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SECURA Insurance. (Nolan, Blake)
January 31, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint,,,,, by (fer) Studio, LLP, Douglas V. Pierson. (Robertson, William)
January 29, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to (fer) Studio, LLP, BTM Engineering, Inc., Commonwealth Roofing Corp., Duro-Last, Inc., Hussung Mechanical Contractors, Inc., K. Norman Berry Associates, Architects, PLLC, Louisville Panels, LLC, Peak Construction, Inc., Douglas V. Pierson, St. Francis School, Inc., T.C. Peters Construction Co.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons) (DAK)
January 28, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST against (fer) Studio, LLP, BTM Engineering, Inc., Commonwealth Roofing Corp., Duro-Last, Inc., Hussung Mechanical Contractors, Inc., K. Norman Berry Associates, Architects, PLLC, Louisville Panels, LLC, Peak Construction, Inc., Douglas V. Pierson, St. Francis School, Inc., T.C. Peters Construction Co., filed by SECURA Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Policy (1-86), #2 Exhibit 1-Policy (87-173), #3 Exhibit 1-Policy (174-259), #4 Exhibit 1-Policy (260-346), #5 Exhibit 1-Policy (347-433), #6 Exhibit 1-Policy (434-520), #7 Exhibit 2-Umbrella Policy (521-622), #8 Exhibit 2-Umbrella Policy (623-724), #9 Exhibit 3-Underlying Complaint, #10 Exhibit 4-Amendment to AIA, #11 Exhibit 5-Studio & Pierson Answer and Crossclaim, #12 Exhibit 6-Peak Answer and Crossclaim, #13 Exhibit 7-Berry Answer and Crossclaim, #14 Exhibit 8-Comm Roofing Answer and Counterclaim, #15 Summons St Francis, #16 Summons Peak Construction, #17 Summons BTM Engineering, #18 Summons Comm Roofing, #19 Summons Duro-Last, #20 Summons (fer) Studio, LLP, #21 Summons Douglas V Pierson, #22 Summons Louisville Panels and Fischersips, #23 Summons Hussung Mechanical, #24 Summons K Norman Berry Associates, #25 Summons TC Peters Construction) (Nolan, Blake)
January 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE by SECURA Insurance re #5 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-First Amended Dec Judgment Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2-Louisville Panels and Fischersips, #3 Exhibit 3-(fer Studio, LLP, #4 Exhibit 4-K. Norman Berry Associates) (Nolan, Blake)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 1/18/2019: Within fourteen (14) days of the date of entry of this Order, Plaintiff SECURA Insurance shall SHOW CAUSE why this matter should not be dismissed for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. cc: counsel (JM)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Deficiency re #1 Complaint. Reason for Deficiency: Summons for ALL Defendants not tendered with the Court for issuance. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 1/31/2019. (DJT)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commonwealth Roofing Corp., Duro-Last, Inc., Hussung Mechanical Contractors, Inc., K. Norman Berry Associates, Architects, PLLC, Louisville Panels, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons Duro-Last Inc., #2 Summons as to Fischersips Louisville Panels, #3 Summons as to Hussung Mechanical, #4 Summons as to K. Norman Berry Associates, Architects, PLLC) (DJT)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (DJT)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400.00,Receipt Number 0644-2786950), filed by SECURA Insurance (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Policy (1 - 86), #2 Exhibit 1 - Policy (87 - 173), #3 Exhibit 1 - Policy (174 - 259), #4 Exhibit 1 - Policy (260 - 346), #5 Exhibit 1 - Policy (347 - 433), #6 Exhibit 1 - Policy (434 - 520), #7 Exhibit 2 - Umbrella Policy (521 - 622), #8 Exhibit 2 - Umbrella Policy (623 - 724), #9 Exhibit 3 - Complaint, #10 Exhibit 4 - Amendment to AIA, #11 Exhibit 5 - Answer Studio Pierson, #12 Exhibit 6 - Answer Peak Const, #13 Exhibit 7 - Answer Berry, #14 Exhibit 8 - Comm Roofing, #15 Cover Sheet). (KD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SECURA Insurance v. Peak Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Francis School, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas V. Pierson
Represented By: William Craig Robertson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hussung Mechanical Contractors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Roofing Corp.
Represented By: Denis C. Wiggins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duro-Last, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisville Panels, LLC
Represented By: John William Walters
Represented By: Douglas P. Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Norman Berry Associates, Architects, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peak Construction, Inc.
Represented By: David Lee Sage, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fer) Studio, LLP
Represented By: William Craig Robertson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BTM Engineering, Inc.
Represented By: Justin T. Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.C. Peters Construction Co.
Represented By: David B. Tachau
Represented By: Katherine L. Crosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SECURA Insurance
Represented By: James W. Taylor
Represented By: Blake C. Nolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?