Singleton v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Donald K. Singleton, II
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Trans Union, LLC, Equifax Information Services, LLC and Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00095
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Filing 21 Partial MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bailen, Neal)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AGREED ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 3/21/2019: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. shall have up to and including 4/3/2019, to respond to the complaint. cc: counsel (JM)
March 20, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Bailen, Neal)
March 20, 2019 Filing 18 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation re #1 by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Bailen, Neal)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 3/20/2019 granting #16 Motion to Withdraw Danielle Lewis as Attorney. cc: Counsel(JM)
March 18, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney . (Continue to receive notice:No) by Defendant Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lewis, Danielle)
March 18, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Strike #9 Answer to Complaint by Defendant Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lewis, Danielle)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 3/14/2019 granting #13 Motion for Attorney Thanh-Thuy T. Luong to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (JM)
March 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Thanh-Thuy T. Luong to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2823329. by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Supplement, #3 Proposed Order) (Brannon, Margaret)
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Brannon, Margaret)
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Experian PLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Brannon, Margaret)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent CL Holdings, LLC for Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC. by Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC. (Lewis, Danielle)
March 5, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC. (Lewis, Danielle)
March 5, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, And Affirmative Defenses by Trans Union, LLC. (Jansen, Sandra)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC. (Herrick, Robert)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC. (Herrick, Robert)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. by Trans Union, LLC. (Jansen, Sandra)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra D. Jansen on behalf of Trans Union, LLC (Jansen, Sandra)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summonses. (Attachments: #1 Summons Jefferson Capital, #2 Summons Portfolio recovery, #3 Summons Equifax, #4 Summons Trans Union, #5 Summons Experian). (RLJ)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (RLJ)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC, Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Trans Union, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2801014. Filed by Donald K. Singleton, II. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (RLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singleton v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Neal F. Bailen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret Jane Brannon
Represented By: Thanh-Thuy T. Luong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Sandra D. Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC
Represented By: Danielle J. Lewis
Represented By: Robert B. Herrick
Represented By: Joseph N. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald K. Singleton, II
Represented By: David W. Hemminger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?