Lopez v. United States Military Entrance Processing Command

Plaintiff: Minyon Lopez
Defendant: United States Military Entrance Processing Command
Case Number: 3:2019cv00099
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Signed by Judge David J. Hale on 3/12/2019 - Plaintiff's motion to dismiss (Docket No. #5 ) is GRANTED. This matter is DISMISSED without prejudice and STRICKEN from the Court's docket. All other pending motions are DENIED as moot. cc: Counsel (KD)
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction due to U.S. Sovereign Immunity by Plaintiff Minyon Lopez (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Hayward, Samuel)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re #1 Notice of Removal from Jefferson Circuit Court, Civil Action Number 18-CI-7419. cc: Counsel, Jefferson Circuit Court. (RLJ)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant United States Military Entrance Processing Command (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Ekman, Michael)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (RLJ)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United States Military Entrance Processing Command from Jefferson Circuit court, case number 18-CI-7419 (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Records) (RLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. United States Military Entrance Processing Command
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minyon Lopez
Represented By: Samuel G. Hayward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Military Entrance Processing Command
Represented By: Michael D. Ekman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?