Rostov v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Susan Rostov
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00107
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Charles R Simpson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Edwards, Richard)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR MEETING & REPORT (EBOC) by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 3/5/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/16/2019. cc: Counsel of Record (KD)
February 14, 2019 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (DJT)
February 14, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Jefferson Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson. (DJT)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (DJT)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [ANSWER FILED] by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-000147. Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-2805257, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court File, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Removal (state court)) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rostov v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard W. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Rostov
Represented By: David Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?