Hall v. Auto Club Property-Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Mary K. Hall
Defendant: Auto Club Property-Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00117
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Regina S Edwards
Referring Judge: David J Hale
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards on 4/5/2019. Based on the pending Joint Motion to Remand ( #9 ), the scheduling conference set for 4/8/2019 is REMANDED from the Court's docket. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (AEH)
April 1, 2019 Filing 11 ***Document attached to DN #9 ***Proposed Order re #9 Joint MOTION to Remand by Auto Club Property-Casualty Insurance Company. (Beyl, Chastity) Modified on 4/2/2019 (KD).
March 28, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION Limiting Damages by Auto Club Property-Casualty Insurance Company. (Beyl, Chastity)
March 28, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Remand by Defendant Auto Club Property-Casualty Insurance Company (Beyl, Chastity) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/2/2019: #1 Proposed Order) (KD).
March 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re #1 Notice of Removal from Jefferson Circuit Court, Civil Action Number 19-CI-330. cc: Counsel, Jefferson Circuit Court. (RLJ)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/8/2019 at 10:45 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. Please see Order for further details. cc: Counsel (KD)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 2/20/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING OF REMOVAL SENT TO JEFFERSON COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT. (RLJ)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Auto Club Insurance Association for Auto Club Property-Casualty Insurance Company, by Auto Club Property-Casualty Insurance Company. (RLJ)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Auto Club Property-Casualty Insurance Company. (RLJ)
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (RLJ)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Auto Club Property-Casualty Insurance Company from Jefferson Circuit court, case number 19-CI-330. ( Filing fee $ 400;receipt number 0644-2807008), filed by Auto Club Property-Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record) (RLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Auto Club Property-Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Club Property-Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Chastity R. Beyl
Represented By: David T. Klapheke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary K. Hall
Represented By: Mark A. Weis
Represented By: Steven R. Romines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?