Mendez v. Ford Motor Company

Plaintiff: Ernardo Mendez
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00121
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Ford Motor Company. (Keal, R.)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay - Telephonic Rule 16 Case-Management Conference set for 5/1/2019 at 9:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. The Court will initiate the call to counsel. Participating counsel shall contact Judge Lindsay's Case Manager, Theresa Burch, by email at theresa_burch@kywd.uscourts.gov with preferred contact numbers by 12:00 p.m. on April 26, 2019. cc: Counsel of Record (KD)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re #1 Notice of Removal from Jefferson Circuit Court, Civil Action Number 19-CI-444. cc: Counsel, Jefferson Circuit Court. (RLJ)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 2/27/2019; pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for resolution of all litigation planning issues, a scheduling conference, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. A separate order scheduling the Rule 16 Conference will be issued by the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge Lindsay. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel. CM-CHL. (ARM)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ford Motor Company. (Keal, R.)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (RLJ)
February 18, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company. (RLJ)
February 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ford Motor Company from Jefferson Circuit court, case number 19-CI-000444. ( Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-2807422), filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Complaint with exhibits, #4 Exhibit Corporate Disclosure Statement (Second Copy)) (RLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendez v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: R. Thad Keal
Represented By: Derek R. Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernardo Mendez
Represented By: John S. Friend
Represented By: Robert W. Bishop
Represented By: Anna C. Beilman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?