Lillacalenia v. The Club House et al

Plaintiff: Dahved Malik Lillacalenia
Defendant: Peak Campus Headquarters and The Club House
Case Number: 3:2019cv00132
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Peak Campus Headquarters, The Club House. Summonses forwarded to the USM for service (Attachments: #1 Summons - The Clubhouse) (MEJ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/17/2019: #2 USM 285) (MEJ).
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 4/16/2019. The Clerk of Court shall issue summons and the United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the complaint [ 1], summons, and this Order on each Defendant in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(2). The parties shall serve upon each party, or counsel, a copy of each document filed in this action as required by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedures. Any paper received by the Court which has not been filed with the Clerk may be disregarded by the Court. Plaintiff must provide written notice of a change of address to the Clerk and to Defendants' counsel. See Local Rule 5.2(e). Plaintiff's failure to notify the Clerk of any address change or failure to comply with this or any subsequent Order of the Court may result in a dismissal of this case. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to mail Plaintiff a copy of the Pro Se Handbook for Non-Prisoners. cc: Counsel, Pro Se Plaintiff (Pro Se Handbook for Non-Prisoners mailed) (MEJ)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 3/18/2019 granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. cc: Counsel, Pro Se Plaintiff (MEJ)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Dahved Malik Lillacalenia (MNM)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (MNM)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Peak Campus Headquarters and The Club House, filed by Dahved Malik Lillacalenia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Summons Tendered) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lillacalenia v. The Club House et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peak Campus Headquarters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Club House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dahved Malik Lillacalenia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?