Watts v. Vonsick et al
Plaintiff: Amanda Watts
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Credit Clearing House of America, Inc., James E. Vonsick, Equifax Information Services, LLC and Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00150
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Referring Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by James E. Vonsick. (Haering, Nicholas)
April 26, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Credit Clearing House of America, Inc. (Herman, Christopher) Modified to add Jury Demand text on 4/29/2019 (AME).
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AGREED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT CREDIT CLEARING HOUSE OF AMERICA, INC. TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Judge David J. Hale on 4/24/2019 - Defendant Credit Clearing House of America, Inc.'s deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended by twenty-one (21) days, up to and including Monday, 4/29/2019. cc: Counsel (KD)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AGREED ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANT JAMES VONSICK'S DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Judge David J. Hale on 4/19/2019. Vonsick's deadline to respond to the Complaint is extended through 4/29/2019. cc: Counsel (MEJ)
April 18, 2019 Filing 18 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation re #1 by James E. Vonsick. (Haering, Nicholas)
April 15, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint And Affirmative Defenses by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Manley, Reid)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 4/9/2019, re #5 - Wells Fargo shall have up to and including 4/15/2019, to file its response to Plaintiff's Complaint. cc: Counsel (KD) Modified on 4/10/2019, to correct linkage to document reflected in the order. (KD)
April 9, 2019 Filing 15 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation re #1 by Credit Clearing House of America, Inc.. (Herman, Christopher)
April 4, 2019 Filing 14 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation re #1 by Credit Clearing House of America, Inc.. (Herman, Christopher)
April 4, 2019 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Credit Clearing House of America, Inc.. (Herman, Christopher)
April 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher T. Herman on behalf of Credit Clearing House of America, Inc. (Herman, Christopher)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Claria Horn Boom recused. Case reassigned to Judge David J. Hale for all further proceedings. Counsel requested to change the civil action number to reflect the initials "DJH" on all further pleadings. cc: Counsel, Case Manager (RLJ)
April 4, 2019 Filing 10 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (MEJ)
March 29, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Williams, John)
March 29, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Williams, John)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings recused. Case reassigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom for all further proceedings. cc: All Counsel, CM to District Judge Claria Horn Boom (KD)
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company, Corporate Parent WFC Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Manley, Reid)
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Manley, Reid)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Amanda Watts (Lawson, James)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Credit Clearing House of America, Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, James E. Vonsick, and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons Tendered as to Credit Clearing House of America, Inc., #2 Summons Tendered as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, #3 Summons Tendered as to Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, #4 Summons Tendered as to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.) (RLJ)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (RLJ)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2816276, filed by Amanda Watts. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (RLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watts v. Vonsick et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Reid S. Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Clearing House of America, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher T. Herman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Vonsick
Represented By: Nicholas M. Haering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: John Michael Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Watts
Represented By: James H. Lawson
Represented By: James R. McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?