State Farm Fire & Casualty Company et al v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brian Arends, Ann Arends and State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc. and Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00151
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Claria Horn Boom
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 12 Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Greer, Todd)
April 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David G. Richardson on behalf of Ann Arends, Brian Arends, State Farm Fire & Casualty Company (Richardson, David)
April 4, 2019 Remark - Attorney Notice of Deficiency #4 re-sent to Samuel A. Gradwohl. (RLK)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT by Judge Claria Horn Boom (EBOC) on 3/21/2019. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 5/14/2019 at 9:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. The Court will initiate the call to counsel. cc: Counsel (MEJ)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 3/20/2019. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Court REFERS this case to United States Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for purposes of: 1) resolving all non-dispositive pretrial motions; 2) generally managing discovery, including resolving all discovery disputes and conducting any hearing(s) other than the pretrial conference; 3) generally managing all pretrial scheduling issues, including altering any dates and/or deadlines, except deadlines for dispositive/Daubert motions, and the pretrial conference and the trial deadlines; 4) conducting a mid-discovery telephonic conference; and 5) conducting a settlement conference, if requested by the parties. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (RLK)
March 13, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Stopher, Edward)
March 13, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Stopher, Edward)
March 12, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.. (Healy, Patrick)
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.. (Healy, Patrick)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Samuel A. Gradwohl re #1 Notice of Removal,.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice not filed. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court.Response due by 3/21/2019. (KJA)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Jefferson Circuit Court (MNM)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Claria Horn Boom. (MNM)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Amazon.com, Inc. from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-000765 (filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2816327). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Notice Filed in State Court, #3 Cover Sheet) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company et al v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Arends
Represented By: Samuel A. Gradwohl
Represented By: David G. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Arends
Represented By: Samuel A. Gradwohl
Represented By: David G. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: Samuel A. Gradwohl
Represented By: David G. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Todd P. Greer
Represented By: Edward H. Stopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Patrick B. Healy
Represented By: Judd R. Uhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?