Hayden et al v. Benchmark Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Matthew Hayden and Kentucky Prosthetics, Inc.
Defendant: VGM Insurance Services, Inc. and Benchmark Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00154
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Lanny King
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AGREED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 4/9/2019 re #9 MOTION to Dismiss: Plaintiff's Response due by 5/10/2019. cc: counsel (JM)
April 5, 2019 Filing 11 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Matthew Hayden, Kentucky Prosthetics, Inc.. (Naiser, A.)
March 29, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Matthew Hayden, Kentucky Prosthetics, Inc.. (Naiser, A.)
March 26, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Benchmark Insurance Company, VGM Insurance Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Underlying State Court Complaint from Hawkins Lawsuit, #2 Exhibit B - Coverage Denial Letter, #3 Proposed Order) (Kleinert, Michael)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AGREED ORDER by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 3/11/2019: Defendants, Benchmark Insurance Company and VGM Insurance Services, Inc., shall have until and including 3/29/2019, to file their responsive pleading to the plaintiffs' complaint. cc: counsel (JM)
March 6, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Benchmark Insurance Company, VGM Insurance Services, Inc.. (Kleinert, Michael)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Jefferson Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal, (DJT)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 3/4/19: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable LANNY KING, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent The VGM Group, Inc. for VGM Insurance Services, Inc.. (DJT)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Trean Corporation for Benchmark Insurance Company.. (DJT)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [NO ANSWER FILED] by VGM Insurance Services, Inc., Benchmark Insurance Company from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-726. Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-2817192, filed by VGM Insurance Services, Inc., Benchmark Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Record) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayden et al v. Benchmark Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Hayden
Represented By: A. Nicholas Naiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kentucky Prosthetics, Inc.
Represented By: A. Nicholas Naiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VGM Insurance Services, Inc.
Represented By: Michael E. Kleinert
Represented By: Matthew W. Breetz
Represented By: Dallas J. Selvy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benchmark Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael E. Kleinert
Represented By: Matthew W. Breetz
Represented By: Dallas J. Selvy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?