Petty v. Bluegrass Cellular, Inc.

Plaintiff: Morgan Rae Petty
Defendant: Bluegrass Cellular, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00193
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 18:2707
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Defendant's Reply re #6 Reply filed by Morgan Rae Petty. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (MEJ)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 REPLY re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Bluegrass Cellular, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena with Certificate of Service) (Main, Marisa)
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Morgan Rae Petty. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order). (RLJ)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Defendant Bluegrass Cellular, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - Subpoena for Morgan Petty's Text Records, #3 Exhibit B - Witness and Exhbit List, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Main, Marisa)
March 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bluegrass Cellular, Inc.. Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (RLJ)
March 18, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (RLJ)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bluegrass Cellular, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number L33059185), filed by Morgan Rae Petty. (RLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petty v. Bluegrass Cellular, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bluegrass Cellular, Inc.
Represented By: Marisa E. Main
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Rae Petty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?