Cantrell v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Keisha Cantrell
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00210
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 18 Mail Returned as Undeliverable #13 #14 sent to Keisha Cantrell. (DJT)
July 1, 2019 Filing 17 Mail Returned as Undeliverable #13 #14 sent to Keisha Cantrell. (DJT)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 6/24/2019. Upon request of plaintiff for a continuance, and by agreement of counsel for the defendant, the show cause hearing of 6/17/2019 is CONTINUED to 7/18/2019 11:00 AM in Louisville Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: pro se plaintiff, counsel (TLB)
June 5, 2019 Filing 15 Return of Service Executed DN #13 & #14 as to Keisha Cantrell. (DJT)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 5/31/19: Show Cause Hearing set for 6/17/2019 at 11:00 AM in Louisville Courtroom before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay.cc: Counsel, Plaintiff(multiple addresses) (DJT)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 5/31/19; granting #11 Motion for Relief from Portions of Order cc: Counsel, Pro Se Plaintiff(2 addresses) (DJT)
May 29, 2019 Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay; Scheduling Conference held on 5/29/2019. (DJT)
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 Proposed REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Ford Motor Company. (Keal, R.)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION For Relief from Portions of Order by Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5-2-2019 letter to Plaintiff, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion) (Keal, R.)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 5/1/19; granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File: The Parties shall conduct their Rule 26(f) conference on or before 5/17/2019. The Parties shall file a written joint report outlining the proposed discovery plan no later than 5/24/2019. The 5/14/2019 Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is RESCHEDULED for 5/29/2019 at 11:00 AM ET. Further, though the Rule 16 was originally set to be conducted telephonically, as Cantrell is pro se, the 5/29/2019 Scheduling Conference will be conducted IN PERSON before the undersigned at the Gene Snyder U.S. Courthouse, 601 W. Broadway, Louisville, Kentucky 40202. cc: Counsel, Plaintiff(pro se) w/ DN #6 (DJT)
April 16, 2019 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable #6 sent to Keisha Cantrell. (DJT)
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Report of and Conduct Planning Meeting by Defendant Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Keal, R.)
April 2, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable #1 - 5 sent to Keisha Cantrell. (DJT)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER (EBOC) by Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 3/25/19: Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure due by 4/15/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/29/2019. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 5/14/2019 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. cc: Counsel, Keisha Cantrell(pro se), Theresa Burch (DJT)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 3/21/19: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable COLIN H. LINDSAY, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Jefferson Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT)
March 21, 2019 ANSWER by Ford Motor Company. (DJT)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company. (DJT)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [ANSWER FILED] by Ford Motor Company from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 18-CI-002796. Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-2829316, filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit Answer, #4 Exhibit Order Granting Plaintiff's Counsel's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel, #5 Exhibit Entered Joint Stipulated Protective Order) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cantrell v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keisha Cantrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: R. Thad Keal
Represented By: Derek R. Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?