Bokkenheuser v. Seeley

Plaintiff: Kimberly Seeley Bokkenheuser
Defendant: Robert Lloyd Seeley
Case Number: 3:2019cv00268
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER by Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 5/20/2019: (1) Plaintiff's motion to schedule an evidentiary hearing is GRANTED. (2) The Court will conduct an EVIDENTIARY HEARING on Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment #7 on 8/6/2019 at 9:30 AM EDT in Louisville Courtroom before Judge Joseph H. McKinley Jr.; and (3) A pre-hearing brief shall be filed on or before 7/23/2019. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel, Defendant (EAS)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Robert Lloyd Seeley. cc: Robert Lloyd Seeley (JM)
May 17, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re 6 MOTION for Default Judgment: ERROR - e-filer only selected default judgment as the motion relief for this entry. Clerk has refiled this pleading with additional motion reliefs. Please see DN #7 for viewing. (ALS)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Default, MOTION for Default Judgment, MOTION for Evidentiary Hearing by Plaintiff Kimberly Seeley Bokkenheuser (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Kimberly Seeley Bokkenheuser, #2 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Michael J. Gartland, #3 Proposed Order) (ALS)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 ERROR - incorrectly filed by e-filer. Clerk has refiled this entry . Please see DN #7 for viewing.
April 15, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kimberly Seeley Bokkenheuser. All Defendants. Answer Due 5/2/2019 (Gartland, Michael)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr on 4/10/19: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable COLIN H. LINDSAY, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Robert Lloyd Seeley. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (DJT)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert Lloyd Seeley Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2842719., filed by Kimberly Seeley Bokkenheuser. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Loan and Consolidation Application and Promissory Note dated November, #3 Exhibit 2 - Letter from Kimberly Seeley Bokkenheuser to Michael Theodorou dated, #4 Exhibit 3 - Letter by NY State Higher Education Services Corporation to Kimberly) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bokkenheuser v. Seeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Seeley Bokkenheuser
Represented By: Michael J. Gartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Lloyd Seeley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?