Heavrin v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Shawn Heavrin
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., TransUnion, LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00275
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Charles R Simpson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Bailen, Neal)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AGREED ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III on 6/11/2019 re #13 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation. Plaintiff's claims of negligence and defamation against Wells Fargo are hereby dismissed with prejudice and Wells Fargo's responsive pleading on the remaining claims shall be due 21 days after entry of this Agreed Order. cc: Counsel (RLJ)
May 31, 2019 Filing 13 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Bailen, Neal)
May 31, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Bailen, Neal)
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal F. Bailen on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Bailen, Neal)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 5/21/2019, GRANTING #9 Motion for Thanh-Thuy T. Luong to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(RLK)
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Thanh-Thuy T. Luong to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2866453. by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Supplement, #3 Proposed Order) (Brannon, Margaret)
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by TransUnion, LLC. (Jansen, Sandra)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Brannon, Margaret)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Experian PLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Brannon, Margaret)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for TransUnion, LLC. by TransUnion, LLC. (Jansen, Sandra)
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra D. Jansen on behalf of TransUnion, LLC (Jansen, Sandra)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., TransUnion, LLC, and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (MNM)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., TransUnion, LLC, and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2844389, filed by Shawn Heavrin. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (MNM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heavrin v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Heavrin
Represented By: David W. Hemminger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Neal F. Bailen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion, LLC
Represented By: Sandra D. Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret Jane Brannon
Represented By: Thanh-Thuy T. Luong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?