Nordman v. The Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Dean Nordman
Defendant: Christine Wideman, The Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society, Inc., John Doe 3, John Doe 2 and John Doe 1
Case Number: 3:2019cv00279
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Take Deposition to Perpetuate and Preserve Testimony filed by The Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society, Inc.. (Melton, Christopher)
July 8, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re 14 Reply to Response to Motion; Error:Incorrect document attached; Correction:E-filer refiled the entry and attached correct document. (MLG)
July 5, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Compel Arbitration Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss or in the alternative, to compel arbitration and stay matter filed by The Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society, Inc.. (Watts, Julie)
July 5, 2019 Filing 14 INCORRECT Document attached by e-filer. Refiled correctly DN #15 (Watts, Julie) Modified on 7/8/2019 (MLG).
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 6/26/2019 granting #13 Motion for Leave to File. See DN #12 for PDF. (RLJ)
June 26, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Redacted Version of Document Previously Filed as DN 9-1 by Plaintiff Dean Nordman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redacted Version of DN 9-1, #2 Proposed Order) (Varellas, Sandra)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER (EBOC) by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 6/26/2019 - Plaintiff filed a document (DN 9-1) which contains personal data identifiers. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to RESTRICT electronic access to this document (DN 9-1) to Court users and participants in the case. Plaintiff shall file a motion to seal the document or a motion seeking leave to file a redacted version of the document along with a copy of the redacted version within 7 days of the entry date of this Order. Plaintiff files a motion seeking leave to file a redacted version of the document, the motion will be GRANTED, and the Clerk will replace the document containing personal identifiers with the redacted version. cc: Counsel of Record (KD)
June 21, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #10 MOTION to Take Deposition to Perpetuate and Preserve Testimony. Error: Proposed Order filed as separate document. Correction: Proposed Order attached to the appropriate Motion by Court. (RLJ)
June 21, 2019 Filing 11 ERROR: DOCKETED AS SEPARATE DOCUMENT; DOCYMENT ATTACHED TO DN #10 (RLJ).
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Take Deposition to Perpetuate and Preserve Testimony by Plaintiff Dean Nordman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter to Defendant) (Varellas, Sandra) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/21/2019: #2 Proposed Order) (RLJ).
June 20, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Compel Arbitration filed by Dean Nordman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Administration Record Report) (Varellas, Sandra) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/27/2019) (RLJ).
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 Sealed Document re #7 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Lombart Evaluation, #2 Exhibit B - Mian Report, #3 Exhibit C - Coffing Assessment, #4 Exhibit D - Lombart Evaluation Amended, #5 Proposed Order) (Varellas, Sandra)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Seal Document by Plaintiff Dean Nordman (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support) (Varellas, Sandra)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Power of Attorney by Dean Nordman (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Power of Attorney) (Varellas, Sandra)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society, Inc.. (Watts, Julie)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Compel Arbitration by Defendant The Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Julie Laemmle Watts, #2 Proposed Order Lack of Standig, #3 Proposed Order Failure to State a Claim, #4 Proposed Order Compel Arbitration) (Melton, Christopher)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3, The Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society, Inc., and Christine Wideman. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summonses. (Attachments: #1 Summons Christine Wideman, #2 Summons John Doe No. 1, #3 Summons John Doe No. 2, #4 Summons John Doe No. 3). (RLJ)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (RLJ)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3, The Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society, Inc., Christine Wideman (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2844997.), filed by Dean Nordman. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet). (RLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nordman v. The Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Wideman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Evangelical Lutheran Good Samaritan Society, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher A. Melton
Represented By: Donald J. Kelly
Represented By: Julie L. Watts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Nordman
Represented By: David T. Varellas
Represented By: D. Todd Varellas
Represented By: Sandra M. Varellas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?