France v. Caito Foods, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Tammy France
Defendant: The Kroger Co. and Caito Foods, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00283
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 6/27/2019 granting #18 Motion for Isabelle M. Chammas to Appear Pro Hac Vice This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel(TLB)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 6/27/2019 granting #17 Motion for Alyssa L. Rebensdorf to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(TLB)
June 21, 2019 Filing 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Tammy France. (Poppe, Hans)
June 14, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Isabelle M. Chammas to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2885778. by Defendant Caito Foods, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - KY ECF, #2 Exhibit B -COGS, #3 Proposed Order) (Gay, Matthew)
June 14, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Alyssa L. Rebensdorf to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2885639. by Defendant Caito Foods, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- ECF, #2 Exhibit B - COGS) (Gay, Matthew)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 6/11/2019. Upon request of counsel and by agreement of the parties, the telephonic scheduling conference set for 7/23/2019 is REMANDED from the docket and RESCHEDULED for 8/1/2019 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (TLB)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 6/10/2019. Motion for Jory D. Lange Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice #7 is GRANTED. Motion to Supplement #13 is GRANTED. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(TLB)
May 30, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of filing proposed order by Tammy France re #13 MOTION to Supplement re #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #12 Order (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Poppe, Hans)
May 30, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Supplement re #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #12 Order by Plaintiff Tammy France (Poppe, Hans) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/31/2019: #1 Proposed Order) (DJT).
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 5/29/2019, re #7 - Mr. Lange is granted seven (7) days from the date of this Order's entry to supplement his motion. cc: Counsel of Record (KD)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER (EBOC) by Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr on 5/17/2019: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/23/2019 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/21/2019. cc: counsel, TB (JM)
May 14, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caito Foods, LLC. (Gay, Matthew)
May 14, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Caito Foods, LLC. (Gay, Matthew)
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Tammy France (Poppe, Hans)
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Jory D. Lange, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2863024. by Plaintiff Tammy France (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing USDC, #2 Certifcate of Good Standing TX bar) (Poppe, Hans)
May 1, 2019 ***Answer Date Set to 5/14/2019. (DJT)
April 30, 2019 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed/Unexecuted as to Caito Foods, LLC. (Poppe, Hans)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed/Unexecuted as to The Kroger Co.. (Poppe, Hans)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 4/16/19: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable COLIN H. LINDSAY, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Caito Foods, LLC, The Kroger Co.. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Kroger) (DJT)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Caito Foods, LLC, The Kroger Co. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2846306., filed by Tammy France. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: France v. Caito Foods, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caito Foods, LLC
Represented By: Isabelle M. Chammas
Represented By: Alyssa L. Rebensdorf
Represented By: Matthew B. Gay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy France
Represented By: Hans G. Poppe
Represented By: Kirk A. Laughlin
Represented By: Jory D. Lange, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?