Stone v. Aetna
Plaintiff: Tenna Stone
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company and Aetna
Case Number: 3:2019cv00312
Filed: April 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 5/13/2019; pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for resolution of all litigation planning issues, a scheduling conference, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. A separate order scheduling the Rule 16 Conference will be issued by the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge Lindsay This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel,CM-CHL. (ARM)
May 2, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record and Jefferson Circuit Court (ALS)
May 1, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Wahlheim, William)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 5/1/2019 granting #5 Motion William B. Wahlheim, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (RLJ)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 5/1/2019 granting #4 Motion for Grace R. Murphy to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (MEJ)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for William B. Wahlheim, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2856120. by Defendant Aetna Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of William Wahlheim, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Wahlheim, William)
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Grace R. Murphy to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2855054. by Defendant Aetna Life Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of Grace Murphy, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Murphy, Grace)
April 24, 2019 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (ALS)
April 24, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Aetna for Aetna Life Insurance Company. by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (ALS)
April 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Aetna Life Insurance Company from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-01939. ( Filing fee $ 400 - receipt number 0644-2852694), filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Documents) (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stone v. Aetna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Represented By: William B. Wahlheim, Jr.
Represented By: Grace R. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna
Represented By: William B. Wahlheim, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tenna Stone
Represented By: Robert A. Florio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?