Waller v. Cigna Group Insurance
Plaintiff: Susan Waller
Defendant: Cigna Group Insurance and Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00338
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441eb
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REFERENCE ORDER signed by Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. Case reassigned to Magistrate Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. cc: counsel, CHL (TB) (JM)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Cigna Group Insurance, Susan Waller (JM)
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Cigna Group Insurance. (Wahlheim, William)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 5/23/2019 granting #8 and #9 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William B. Wahlheim, Jr. and Grace R. Murphy. cc: Counsel(JM)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Grace R. Murphy to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2869100. by Defendant Cigna Group Insurance (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of Grace Murphy, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Murphy, Grace)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for William B. Wahlheim, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2869092. by Defendant Cigna Group Insurance (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Affidavit of William Wahlheim, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Wahlheim, William)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr on 5/17/2019: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/23/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/21/2019. cc: counsel, TB (JM)
May 7, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Cigna Group Insurance. (Murphy, Grace)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Jefferson Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr on 5/3/19: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable COLIN H. LINDSAY, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel (DJT)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Corporation, Corporate Parent Connecticut General Corporation, Corporate Parent Cigna Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Cigna Holding Company for Cigna Group Insurance. (DJT)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [NO ANSWER FILED] by Cigna Group Insurance from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-02036. Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-2858294, filed by Cigna Group Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A Court Documents, #3 Exhibit B Plan Documents) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waller v. Cigna Group Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cigna Group Insurance
Represented By: William B. Wahlheim, Jr.
Represented By: Grace R. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: William B. Wahlheim, Jr.
Represented By: Grace R. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Waller
Represented By: Robert A. Florio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?