Management Registry, Inc. v. Cloud Consulting Partners, Inc.

Plaintiff: Management Registry, Inc.
Defendant: Cloud Consulting Partners, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00340
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Referring Judge: Joseph H McKinley
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #6 MOTION to Dismiss Due to Compulsory Arbitration Agreement and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and, in the Alternative, Motion for Transfer of Venue MOTION to Change Venue (Motion for Enlargement Following Expiration of Deadline) by Plaintiff Management Registry, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proffered Response to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order) (Morris, James)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 7/1/19; denying #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply cc: Counsel(DJT)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Remand and Objection filed by Cloud Consulting Partners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Whittaker Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - March 12-18 emails, #3 Exhibit C - March 26 email, #4 Exhibit D - Docket, #5 Exhibit E - March 27-April 6 emails, #6 Proposed Order) (Goff, Lea)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Due to Compulsory Arbitration Agreement and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and, in the Alternative, Motion for Transfer of Venue MOTION to Change Venue and Objection filed by Cloud Consulting Partners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Goff, Lea)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss Due to Compulsory Arbitration Agreement and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and, in the Alternative, Motion for Transfer of Venue MOTION to Change Venue by Plaintiff Management Registry, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Morris, James)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Management Registry, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit E-mail from Cloud waiving formal service, #3 Exhibit E-mail delivering Complaint and Summons, #4 Exhibit E-mail responding to Complaint, #5 Proposed Order) (Morris, James)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Due to Compulsory Arbitration Agreement and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and, in the Alternative, MOTION for Transfer of Venue by Defendant Cloud Consulting Partners, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF CLOUD CONSULTINGS MOTION TO DISMISS DUE TO COMPULSORY ARBITRATION AGREEMENT AND LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION AND, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR TRANSFER OF VENUE, #2 Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit Grubb Declaration, #4 Exhibit Agreement and Statement of Work) (Goff, Lea). Added MOTION to Change Venue on 5/10/2019 (DJT).
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Cloud Consulting Partners, Inc.. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, by Cloud Consulting Partners, Inc.. (MLG)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER by Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 5/6/19: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable COLIN H. LINDSAY, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel (JM)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER re #1 Notice of Removal. (JM)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (JM)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cloud Consulting Partners, Inc. from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-01965. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0644-2859992), filed by Cloud Consulting Partners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (JM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Management Registry, Inc. v. Cloud Consulting Partners, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Management Registry, Inc.
Represented By: James M. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cloud Consulting Partners, Inc.
Represented By: Sara A. Johnston
Represented By: Lea Pauley Goff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?