Williams v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.
Plaintiff: Kikia Williams
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00373
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay (EBOC) on 6/27/2019. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/28/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. cc: Counsel (AME)
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.. (Mathisen, Eric)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 6/11/2019 granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The defendant shall respond to the complaint by 6/26/2019. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(TLB)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 6/11/2019 granting #6 Motion for Eric P. Mathisen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(TLB)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 5/28/2019;Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Roberts, Kevin)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Eric P. Mathisen to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2871424. by Defendant Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Eric P. Mathisen, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Roberts, Kevin)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE: re #1 Notice of Removal - mailed Notice to Jefferson Circuit Court. (AME)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin E. Roberts on behalf of Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. (AME)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (AME)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. (AME)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-02642, (Filing fee $400.00), filed by Lincoln National Life Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing). (AME)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Co.
Represented By: Kevin E. Roberts
Represented By: Eric P. Mathisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kikia Williams
Represented By: Robert A. Florio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?