Koeneman v. Nationwide Advisory Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Seth Koeneman
Defendant: Nationwide Advisory Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00374
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by Nationwide Advisory Solutions, Inc.. (Inman, J.)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AGREED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 6/26/2019, re #6 - Defendant Nationwide Advisory Solutions, Inc. shall have up to and including July 19, 2019, by which to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint. cc: Counsel (KD)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation by Nationwide Advisory Solutions, Inc.. (Inman, J.)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nationwide Advisory Solutions, Inc. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (RLJ)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Nationwide Advisory Solutions, Inc., filed by Seth Koeneman. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Dutkanych, Andrew)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Nationwide Advisory Solutions, Inc. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (ALS)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (ALS)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nationwide Advisory Solutions, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2870651) filed by Seth Koeneman. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koeneman v. Nationwide Advisory Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Advisory Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: J. Andrew Inman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seth Koeneman
Represented By: Kiboni A. Yarling
Represented By: Andrew Dutkanych, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?