Sharp v. Louisville Metro Housing Authority
Plaintiff: Ronald Sharp
Defendant: Louisville Metro Housing Authority
Case Number: 3:2019cv00400
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: David J Hale
Referring Judge: Colin H Lindsay
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Ronald Sharp. (Bush, Christopher)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Louisville Metro Housing Authority. (Moad, Jeffrey)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ronald Sharp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-D) (Bush, Christopher)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 6/13/2019. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/13/2019 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. The Court will initiate the call to counsel. cc:counsel (ALS)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 6/12/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards. cc: Counsel of Record, CM - Judge Hale (KD)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER by Judge David J. Hale on 6/11/2019; Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is hereby referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Regina S. Edwards, for resolution of all litigation planning issues, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge Edwards is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (NWT)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Louisville Metro Housing Authority. (Risley, Michael)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE: re #1 Notice of Removal - mailed copy of Notice to Jefferson Circuit Court. (AME)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge David J. Hale. (AME)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Louisville Metro Housing Authority from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-02927. (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0644-2876662), filed by Louisville Metro Housing Authority. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing). (AME)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharp v. Louisville Metro Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Sharp
Represented By: Christopher D. Bush
Represented By: Jonathan S. Ricketts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisville Metro Housing Authority
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Moad
Represented By: Michael D. Risley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?