Swearingen v. Capital One Auto Finance, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ardelia Swearingen
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Capital One Auto Finance, Inc., Trans Union, LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00428
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Charles R Simpson
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AGREED ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III on 8/7/2019, re #12 - Plaintiff's deadline to file his Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is hereby extended to 8/25/2019. cc: Counsel (KD)
August 6, 2019 Filing 12 Proposed Agreed Order/Stipulation re #11 by Ardelia Swearingen. (Hemminger, David)
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Capital One Auto Finance, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order) (Manley, Reid)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, And Affirmative Defenses by Trans Union, LLC. (Jansen, Sandra)
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Experian PLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Brannon, Margaret)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Brannon, Margaret)
July 8, 2019 Filing 7 SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE as to Capital One Auto Finance, Inc. COMPLETED on 7/8/2019. Secretary of State return states 6/21/2019. (KD)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. by Trans Union, LLC. (Jansen, Sandra)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sandra D. Jansen on behalf of Trans Union, LLC (Jansen, Sandra)
June 21, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re 4 Notice of Removal; Error:New Case filed incorrectly in existing case; Correction:Case removed by Clerk, advised e-filer to refile case as New Case and file Request for Fee Refund. (MLG)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 ERROR: NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Pullen, Andrew) Modified on 6/21/2019 - New Case filed incorrectly. (MLG).
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Capital One Auto Finance, Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (Attachments: #1 Summons Equifax, #2 Summons Experian, #3 Summons Trans Union) (ALS)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (ALS)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capital One Auto Finance, Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Trans Union, LLC (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0644-2884346) filed by Ardelia Swearingen. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swearingen v. Capital One Auto Finance, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ardelia Swearingen
Represented By: David W. Hemminger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Auto Finance, Inc.
Represented By: Reid S. Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Sandra D. Jansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Margaret Jane Brannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?