Chapman v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Thomas Chapman
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00442
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Rebecca Grady Jennings
Referring Judge: Lanny King
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT by Magistrate Judge Lanny King on 7/26/2019: Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/9/2019 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Lanny King. cc: counsel (JM)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 7/24/2019; pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Lanny L. King for resolution of all litigation planning issues, a scheduling conference, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Judge King is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. A separate order scheduling the Rule 16 Conference will be issued by the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge King. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc:counsel,CM-LLK (ARM)
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Jefferson Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal, (DJT)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (DJT)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (DJT)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (DJT)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL [ANSWER FILED] by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-003178. Filing fee $ 400; receipt number 0644-2887346, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Record) (DJT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chapman v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: David T. Klapheke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Chapman
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Freeman
Represented By: Sam Aguiar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?