Davis v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Linda Davis
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company and State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00466
Filed: June 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Kentucky
Presiding Judge: Charles R Simpson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446mv
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Klapheke, David)
August 7, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Linda Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Proposed Order) (Aguiar, Sam)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III on 8/6/2019. Defendants' Motion to Stay Briefing on Class Certification is GRANTED. Briefing on Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class (DN #6 ) is stayed pending further Order of the Court. (ALS)
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Stay re #6 MOTION to Certify Class by Defendants State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Klapheke, David)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Certified Policy for Cadillac Deville, #3 Exhibit B - Certified Policy for Jeep Grand Cherokee, #4 Proposed Order) (Klapheke, David)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 7/24/2019, GRANTING #8 and #9 Motions for Sondra A. Hemeryck and Joseph A. Cancila, Jr., to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the Defendants. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(RLK)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Joseph A. Cancila Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2908013. by Defendants State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Good Standing Certificate, #2 ECF Registration Form) (Klapheke, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2019: #3 Proposed Order) (ALS).
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Sondra A. Hemeryck to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 125, receipt number 0644-2907994. by Defendants State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Good Standing Certificate, #2 ECF Registration Form) (Klapheke, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/23/2019: #3 Proposed Order) (ALS).
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Signed by Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson, III on 7/18/2019 granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Defendants shall have until 7/29/2019, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. cc: Counsel (CDF)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Certify Class by Plaintiff Linda Davis (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order) (Aguiar, Sam)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant State Farm Fire & Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Klapheke, David)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal from Jefferson Circuit Court, Civil Action Number 19-CI-003158. cc: Counsel, Jefferson Circuit Court (ALS)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Charles R. Simpson III. (ALS)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (ALS)
June 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 19-CI-003158. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0644-2894234) filed by State Farm Fire & Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Record, #2 Cover Sheet) (ALS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kentucky Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: David T. Klapheke
Represented By: Joseph A. Cancila, Jr.
Represented By: Sondra A. Hemeryck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: David T. Klapheke
Represented By: Joseph A. Cancila, Jr.
Represented By: Sondra A. Hemeryck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Davis
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Freeman
Represented By: Sam Aguiar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?